EP1927710 - Disconnectable bolt, in particular for a locking mechanism of an automobile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Sécurité Habitacle 76 rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | [2013/31] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Valeo Sécurité Habitacle 76 rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Propriété Industrielle 42 rue le Corbusier - Europarc 94042 Creteil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giacomin, Fabrice, @Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Propriété industrielle 42 rue Le Corbusier - Europarc 94042 Créteil / FR | [2013/31] |
Former [2008/23] | 01 /
Giacomin, Fabrice, Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Propriété industrielle, 42 rue Le Corbusier - Europarc 94042 Créteil / FR | Representative(s) | Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob, et al Innovincia 11, avenue des Tilleuls 74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR | [2013/28] |
Former [2010/48] | Jacquot, Ludovic R. G., et al Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Propriété Industrielle 76 rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07121367.2 | 22.11.2007 | [2008/23] | Priority number, date | FR20060055176 | 29.11.2006 Original published format: FR 0655176 | [2008/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927710 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927710 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/04, E05B17/00, E05B65/12 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
E05B17/0058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Title | German: | Ausschaltbares Schloss für Schließmechanismus eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2008/23] | English: | Disconnectable bolt, in particular for a locking mechanism of an automobile | [2008/23] | French: | Verrou débrayable notamment pour mécanisme de serrure de véhicule automobile | [2008/23] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 27.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2007 | AT | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | ES | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | IT | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | LV | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | MT | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IE | 22.11.2013 | LU | 22.11.2013 | BE | 30.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | [2019/40] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 22.11.2007 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 22.11.2013 | ||
LU | 22.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.11.2007 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 22.11.2013 | ||
LU | 22.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 22.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IE | 22.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
PT | 02.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4122414 (HUELSBECK & FUERST [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,6,19-21 * column 1, lines 1-44 * * column 5, line 65 - column 8, line 39; figures 1,2,4,7-9 *; | [A]DE4410736 (EWALD WITTE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6,19-21 * column 1, lines 1-12 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 62; figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]US2004255627 (SHIMON GARY C [US]) [A] 1-10,21* paragraphs [0030] - [0067]; figures 1-9 * |