EP2063327 - Electronic circuit for managing the operation of peripheral devices of a watch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EM Microelectronic-Marin SA Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Godat, Yves Chênes 4 2087, Cornaux / CH | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2009/22] | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Fbg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 07121548.7 | 26.11.2007 | [2009/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2063327 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G04G1/02 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
G04G21/00 (EP,US);
G04G19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/05] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronischer Funktionssteuerungsschaltkreis von Peripheriegeräten einer Uhr | [2009/22] | English: | Electronic circuit for managing the operation of peripheral devices of a watch | [2009/22] | French: | Circuit électronique de gestion du fonctionnement de périphériques d'une montre | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/24] | 30.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04316114 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5289452 (SAKAMOTO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, lines 9-29; figure 1 * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 24 * * column 9, lines 37-44 *; | [A]US7072080 (YAMAMOTO HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 5, lines 26-37; figures 1-4 * * column 7, line 17 - column 8, line 35 *; | [A]US2006285442 (MAEDER JEAN-BERNARD [CH]) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 * |