Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HU | | IE | | IT | | LI | | LU | | MC | | NL | | PT | | RO | | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 08.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | European patent granted | 15.12.2010 | Opposition procedure | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2011 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 05.03.2008 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20071126 | | Event date: | 05.03.2008 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 1542658 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 05.03.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 21.05.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | OSHLACK, BENJAMIN | | Event date: | 21.05.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HUANG, HUA-PIN | | Event date: | 21.05.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | GULLAPALLI, RAMPURNA | | Event date: | 21.05.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MACHONIS, MEREDITH | | Event date: | 04.06.2008 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. | | Event date: | 18.06.2008 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20080520 | | Event date: | 27.08.2008 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED (CORRECTED) | Effective DATE: | 20080728 | | Event date: | 12.11.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 23.06.2010 | | Event description: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING AN OPIOID ANTAGONIST | | Event date: | 15.12.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 15.12.2010 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 1542658 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 15.12.2010 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 15.12.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 31.12.2010 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | ANDRE ROLAND IPS CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INTELLECTUE | | Event date: | 19.01.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 27.01.2011 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 60335426 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20110127 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 14.01.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20110107 | | Event date: | 29.03.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 06.06.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 9001 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 15.06.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E005209 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20110310 | | Event date: | 06.05.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2358151 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20110425 | | Event date: | 29.08.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E010788 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 23.11.2011 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20110916 | | Event date: | 28.03.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Event date: | 31.01.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PCAR | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE | Free Format Text: | ANDRE ROLAND S.A.;CASE POSTALE 5107;1002 LAUSANNE (CH) | | Event date: | 16.03.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 03.03.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG RO EPE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA | | Event date: | 12.01.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 60335426 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20110916 | | Event date: | 01.03.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20110400033 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20110218 | | Event date: | 30.05.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60335426 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE | | Event date: | 30.06.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60335426 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE | | Event date: | 30.06.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60335426 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | EURO-CELTIQUE S.A., LU | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: EURO-CELTIQUE S.A., LUXEMBURG, LU | | Event date: | 30.05.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60335426 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | EURO-CELTIQUE S.A., LU | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: EURO-CELTIQUE S.A., LUXEMBOURG, LU | | Event date: | 19.07.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 20.07.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.08.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20170721 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 29.09.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20170721 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20170719 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20170721 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20170720 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20170904 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20170719 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20170719 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20170720 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20170724 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20170720 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Payment DATE: | 20170803 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20170724 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20170719 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20170724 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20170719 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20170731 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20170720 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20170724 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20170720 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20170801 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20170802 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20170719 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20170721 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20170828 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20170720 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.05.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60335426 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | MAIWALD PATENTANWALTS- UND RECHTSANWALTSGESELL, DE | | Event date: | 30.06.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60335426 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | MAIWALD PATENTANWALTS- UND RECHTSANWALTSGESELL, DE | | Event date: | 15.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE MM4A E005209 EE | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180831 | | Event date: | 25.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EBP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT LAPSED | Effective DATE: | 20180831 | | Event date: | 29.03.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180831 | | Event date: | 02.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE EUG | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Event date: | 29.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 03.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20180901 | | Event date: | 15.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MM01 491439 AT T | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 01.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 60335426 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Event date: | 24.04.2019 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180831 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180831 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180816 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180831 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 06.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK MM4A E 9001 SK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 10.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20180831 | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180816 | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190307 | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190215 | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180816 | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SI KO00 | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE OF PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20190410 | | Event date: | 29.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Event date: | 28.06.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180901 | | Event date: | 31.07.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 31.07.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 31.07.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180831 | | Event date: | 31.07.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190301 | | Event date: | 30.08.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190430 | | Event date: | 30.08.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180831 | | Event date: | 30.08.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180831 | | Event date: | 18.09.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20190918 | | Event date: | 31.10.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | | Event date: | 31.10.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180816 | | Event date: | 12.11.2010 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 19.10.2010 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 28.05.2010 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 01.02.2008 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 21.10.2011 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 21.10.2011 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 30.06.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180815 | |