EP1928116 - Broadcasting of digital video to mobile terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raysat, Inc. 8460-D Tyco Road Vienna, VA 22182 / US | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rainish, Doran 4 Kisch st. Ramat Gan / IL | 02 /
Barak, Ilan Saul Haggai 20 Kfar Saba / IL | 03 /
Shani, Raz Leah Goldberg 3 Raanana / IL | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07121667.5 | 27.11.2007 | [2008/23] | Priority number, date | US20060861593P | 28.11.2006 Original published format: US 861593 P | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1928116 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1928116 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04N7/26, H03M13/27 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H03M13/2707 (EP,US);
H03M13/2732 (EP,US);
H03M13/2742 (EP,US);
H03M13/6306 (EP,US);
H03M13/6356 (EP,US);
H03M13/6362 (EP,US);
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H04L1/007 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04N19/89 (EP,US);
H03M13/1102 (EP,US);
H03M13/1515 (EP,US);
H03M13/29 (EP,US);
H03M13/2957 (EP,US);
H04L2001/0093 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Title | German: | Rundfunk von digitalen Videos an mobile Endgeräte | [2008/23] | English: | Broadcasting of digital video to mobile terminals | [2008/23] | French: | Diffusion d'une vidéo numérique sur des terminaux mobiles | [2008/23] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/45] | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/45] | Divisional application(s) | EP09156936.8 / EP2101432 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - HUI-LING LOU ET AL, "FEC Scheme for a TDM-OFDM Based Satellite Radio Broadcasting System", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200003), vol. 46, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9316, XP011006118 [X] 1-13,15,16 * abstract * * Section II on pages 60 and 61 * | by applicant | - ERNST ET AL., "Transport Layer Coding for the Land Mobile Satellite Channel", IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, (20040517), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/VETECS.2004.1391458, pages 2916 - 2920, XP010766784 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2004.1391458 | - WU ET AL., "Scalable Video Coding and Transport over Broadband Wireless Networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (200101), vol. 89, no. 1, pages 6 - 20 | - SCHIERL ET AL., "Wireless Broadcasting using the Scalable Extension of H. 264/AVC", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, (20050706), pages 6 - 8 |