EP2067795 - A method for producing a functional vinyl halide polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Formosa Plastics Corporation 201. Tung Hwa N. Rd. Taipei / TW | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Cheng-Jung 201. TUNG HWA N. RD. Taipei / TW | 02 /
Chen, Kwang-Ming 100, Suei-Guan Rd., Jew Wu Hsiang 814, Kaohsiung County / TW | 03 /
Hung, Wan-Tun 100, Suei-Guan Rd., Jew Wu Hsiang 814, Kaohsiung County / TW | 04 /
Ming-Pin 100, Suei-Guan Rd., Jew Wu Hsiang 814, Kaohsiung County / TW | 05 /
Su, Te-Shuan 100, Suei-Guan Rd., Jew Wu Hsiang 814, Kaohsiung County / TW | 06 /
Chen, Yu-Chen 100, Suei-Guan Rd., Jew Wu Hsiang 814, Kaohsiung County / TW | 07 /
Chen, Chung-Chan 100, Suei-Guan Rd., Jew Wu Hsiang 814, Kaohsiung County / TW | 08 /
Huang, Ming-Chung 100, Suei-Guan Rd., Jew Wu Hsiang 814, Kaohsiung County / TW | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/24] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07122306.9 | 04.12.2007 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2067795 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08F14/06, C08F259/04 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
C08F259/04 (EP);
C08F14/06 (EP);
C08F214/06 (EP);
C08F259/00 (EP);
C08F265/04 (EP);
C08L51/003 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F14/06, C08F2/02 (EP);
C08F265/04, C08F214/06 (EP);
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/07] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines funktionalen Vinylhalogenidpolymers | [2009/24] | English: | A method for producing a functional vinyl halide polymer | [2009/24] | French: | Procédé de production d'un polymère d'halogénure de vinyle fonctionnel | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0810241 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * claims 4,1-3 * * page 2, line 31 * * page 4, lines 6-9 * * page 6, line 26 *; | [X]GB1530854 (SOLVAY) [X] 1-9 * claims 1,6 * * page 1, lines 15-19 * * page 2, lines 77-118; example - *; | [X]US5185406 (GRAUER PETER [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7,9 * claims 17,4,5 * * column 4, line 23 * * column 3, lines 42,43 * * column 2, lines 50,51 * * column 1, lines 57-66 *; | [X]US5254630 (SCHMIDT FRANK [DE]) [X] 1-9 * claims 1,4 * * column 2, lines 57-66 * * column A *; | [X]GB1219946 (ICI LTD [GB]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, lines 1-5,17-24,75-77; claims 1,4 *; | [X]US4162239 (NICOLET RENE [CH] ET AL) [X] 1-9 * claims 1,4 * * column 4, line 61 * * column 5, lines 18-33 *; | [A]JPS5731539 (SHINETSU CHEM IND CO) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US3983186 (EILERS KENNETH L ET AL) [A] 1-9 * Example 1, part 2 *; column A; example - *; | [A]EP0894827 (GRANULAT 2000 KUNSTOFF COMPOUN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, lines 4-9 * |