EP1931128 - Apparatus and method of reproducing preferred color [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.01.2020 [2020/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-743 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hong, Ji-young@c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1,Nongseo-dong,Giheung-gu,Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Park, Du-sik@Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1,Nongseo-dong,Giheung-gu,Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kwak, Young-shin@Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1, Nongseo-dong,Giheung-gu,Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/08] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
Hong, Ji-young c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1,Nongseo-dong,Giheung-gu,Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Park, Du-sik Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1,Nongseo-dong,Giheung-gu,Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Kwak, Young-shin Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1, Nongseo-dong,Giheung-gu,Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/08] |
Former [2008/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07122333.3 | 05.12.2007 | [2008/24] | Priority number, date | KR20060123970 | 07.12.2006 Original published format: KR 20060123970 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1931128 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1931128 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1931128 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/62 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
H04N1/62 (EP,US);
H04N9/64 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2019/08] |
Former [2010/19] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Reproduzieren einer bevorzugten Farbe | [2008/24] | English: | Apparatus and method of reproducing preferred color | [2008/24] | French: | Appareil et procédé de reproduction d'une couleur préférée | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 10.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.02.2019 | [2019/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5202935 (KANAMORI KATSUHIRO [US], et al) [A] 1-32* column 6, line 12 - column 17, line 39 *; | [X]EP0709806 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,11,21,27 * page 8, line 54 - page 13, line 36; figures 8-19 *; | [XY]EP0741492 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-32 * page 5, line 30 - page 11, line 12 * [Y] 7-10,17-20; | [X]WO0178372 (AVID TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1,11,21,27 * page 13, lines 1-7 *; | [Y]EP1694054 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 7-10,17-20 * the whole document * |