EP1942030 - Seat for transport vehicle and corresponding transport vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iveco France S.A. 1 Rue des Combats du 24 Août 1944 Porte E 69200 Vénissieux / FR | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giudice, Denis Luc Olivier 20 Rue de Marseille 69007 Lyon / FR | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Borsano, Corrado, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Borsano, Corrado, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07122350.7 | 05.12.2007 | [2008/28] | Priority number, date | FR20060010673 | 07.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0610673 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1942030 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1942030 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/56 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
B60N2/5635 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Title | German: | Sitz für ein Transportfahrzeug und entsprechendes Transportfahrzeug | [2008/28] | English: | Seat for transport vehicle and corresponding transport vehicle | [2008/28] | French: | Siège pour véhicule de transport et véhicule de transport correspondant | [2008/28] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2007 | AT | 04.01.2012 | BE | 04.01.2012 | CY | 04.01.2012 | CZ | 04.01.2012 | DK | 04.01.2012 | EE | 04.01.2012 | FI | 04.01.2012 | LT | 04.01.2012 | LV | 04.01.2012 | MT | 04.01.2012 | PL | 04.01.2012 | RO | 04.01.2012 | SI | 04.01.2012 | SK | 04.01.2012 | TR | 04.01.2012 | BG | 04.04.2012 | GR | 05.04.2012 | IS | 04.05.2012 | PT | 04.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 04.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4238135 (SANDHAM EDWIN C [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4432497 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5577458 (KOHL REX L [US]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X]EP1454790 (GORE W L & ASS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005161193 (MCKENZIE CHRIS [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2006034447 (WET AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4432497 |