EP1940010 - Commutator motor and mounting method for commutator motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hawighorst, Achim Scheffelweg 7 77830 Buehlertal / DE | [2008/27] | Application number, filing date | 07122697.1 | 10.12.2007 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | DE20061062592 | 29.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006062592 | [2008/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1940010 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/14 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
H02K5/148 (EP);
H02K2205/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/11] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommutatormotor und Verfahren zur Montage eines Kommutatormotors | [2008/27] | English: | Commutator motor and mounting method for commutator motor | [2008/27] | French: | Moteur de commutateur et procédé de montage d'un moteur de commutateur | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 06.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/51] | 06.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08186957 (CALSONIC CORP) [X] 1,13 * abstract *; | [DA]EP1469566 (ELEKTRA GMBH SCHALKAU [DE]) [DA] 1-16 * abstract *; | [DA]DE19821053 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]WO0163728 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 10 * abstract *; | [A]US4293789 (KING DALLAS E) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO0250981 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR], et al) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | DE19821053 | EP1469566 | DE19619807 |