EP2071351 - Method and device for providing location services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lethbridge, Simon 11 Rudland Close Thatcham, RG19 3XW / GB | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Akerman, Mårten Lennart, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Akerman, Marten Lennart, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2009/25] | Bratt, Hanna Catharina, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 07122845.6 | 11.12.2007 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2071351 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/00 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
G01S19/37 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Bereitstellung lokaler Dienste | [2009/25] | English: | Method and device for providing location services | [2009/25] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour fournir des services de localisation | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 14.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 18.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2007147434 (NEMERIX SA [CH], et al) [E] 1,3,4,8,10-13,15 * page 11, line 9 - line 20 *; | [X]US2007198981 (JACOBS PAUL E [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] - [0025] , [0026] , [0029]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1832977 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0035]; figure 1 *; | [AD]US2006074554 (HO LONG V [US]) [AD] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A] - AKOS D ET AL, "TUNING IN TO GPS REAL-TIME SOFTWARE RADIO ARCHITECTURES FOR GPS RECEIVERS", GPS WORLD, XX, XX, (20010701), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 28 - 33, XP009027266 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - AKOS ET AL, "Real-Time GPS Software Radio Receiver", PROCEEDINGS OF ION NTM, XX, XX, (20010122), XP002424053 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2006074554 |