EP2070992 - Varnishing systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michael, Günther, Dr. Hugo-Dümler-Str. 24 63791 Karlstein / DE | 02 /
Meyer, Jürgen, Dr. Grossostheimer Str. 51 63811 Stockstadt / DE | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Hans-Ludwig, et al Evonik Degussa GmbH IP Management - Patente und Marken Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Hirsch, Hans-Ludwig, et al Evonik Degussa GmbH Intellectual Property Management PATENTE & MARKEN Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 07122862.1 | 11.12.2007 | [2009/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070992 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/30 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
C09C1/3018 (EP,US);
C09C1/30 (KR);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/11 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/19 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Lacksysteme | [2009/25] | English: | Varnishing systems | [2009/25] | French: | Systèmes de laque | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2007 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 20.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5959005 (HARTMANN WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1* example - *; | [X]WO2004020531 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 8, lines 1-3 * * examples 1-3 *; | [DX]WO2004020532 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [DX] 1 * page 8, lines 1-3 * * claims 1-5 *; | [X]WO2005095525 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1-7 *; | [X]EP1736505 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0021] * * claim 1 * | Examination | - LEDER G, LADWIG T, VALTER V, FRAHN S, MEYER J, "New effects of fumed silica in modern coatings", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20021007), Database accession no. 2002:759845, URL: STN | by applicant | WO2004020532 | WO2007128636 |