EP2070638 - Method for brazing of titanium and aluminium parts and parts obtainable thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Fluor GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Born, Thomas Über der Kirche 1 31188 Holle / DE | 02 /
Swidersky, Hans-Walter Scharnhorststrasse 6 30175 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Ottmann, Alfred Am alten Forsthaus 4 30629 Hannover / DE | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 07122863.9 | 11.12.2007 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070638 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/362, B23K35/36 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
B23K35/362 (EP,US);
B23K35/361 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12493 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/08] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Löten von Titan- und Aluminiumteilen und dadurch gewonnene Teile | [2009/25] | English: | Method for brazing of titanium and aluminium parts and parts obtainable thereby | [2009/25] | French: | Procédé pour le brasage de pièces en titane et en aluminium et pièces pouvant être obtenus par ce procédé | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 26.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US6264096 (BELT HEINZ-JOACHIM [DE], et al) [DA] 1-10 * column 4 *; | [DA]EP1287941 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * paragraphs [0032] - [0039] *; | [DX]US2003178399 (HORBASZ TIBOR [CA], et al) [DX] 1-10 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0017]; claims 3-9 *; | [DA]US2004163734 (ENGLERT PETER [DE], et al); | [DA]US6880746 (SESEKE-KOYRO ULRICH [DE], et al); | [DX]WO2007131993 (SOLVAY FLUOR GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1-10 * pages 2,5, lines 13,14,3-16 - pages 6,7, lines 7,8,33,34,2-6; claims 1-9 *; | [DA]US2007277908 (SESEKE-KOYRO ULRICH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0022] * | by applicant | US3951328 | WO8202014 | US4486647 | US4579605 | US4670067 | US5100048 | US6019856 | US6264096 | US6432221 | EP1287941 | US2003178399 | US2004163734 | US6880746 | WO2005092563 |