EP2053186 - Device for preventing unlocking of door handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY 231, Yangjae-Dong, Seocho-Ku Seoul / KR | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jeongmin 106-1504, Hyoseong Kolon Apt. 1348 Jwa-dong Haeundae-gu 612-777, Busan / KR | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07122886.0 | 11.12.2007 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | KR20070106265 | 22.10.2007 Original published format: KR 20070106265 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2053186 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2053186 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/12, E05B65/20 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
E05B85/16 (EP,KR,US);
E05B77/12 (KR);
B60J5/0412 (KR);
E05B77/06 (EP,KR,US);
E05B85/20 (KR);
B60R2021/0006 (KR);
E05Y2201/47 (KR);
E05Y2201/50 (KR);
E05Y2201/624 (KR);
Y10T292/57 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/01] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verhindern der Entriegelung einer Türklinke | [2009/18] | English: | Device for preventing unlocking of door handle | [2009/18] | French: | Dispositif de prévention de déverrouillage de poignée de porte | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 30.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1050644 (VALEO SICUREZZA ABITACOLO [IT]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, paragraph 9 - column 4, paragraph 26; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1548214 (ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYS [GB]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, paragraph 10 - column 6, paragraph 23; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2007080547 (LEE JONG-HO [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]KR20020030001 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4a * |