Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009102206 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20070106265 | 22.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090040769 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20070106265 | 22.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2053186 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2010 | B1 | EP2053186 | 29.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20070106265 | 22.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602007007957D1 | 02.09.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR20070106265 | 22.10.2007 |