Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
04.03.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.08.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.03.2009 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
21.11.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
13.11.2008 | First examination report | |
11.11.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
24.10.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
27.06.2008 | Change - inventor | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
25.04.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
11.04.2008 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
11.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.03.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
22.12.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |