30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
15.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
29.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
15.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] |
24.09.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
16.07.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
04.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] |
16.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
09.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
26.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
07.08.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
06.08.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.08.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.03.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.01.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
26.12.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] |
16.05.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |