EP2071172 - Canister with overmolded filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalina, Andrzej Ul. Krzyszkowicka 4A 32-020 Wieliczka / PL | 02 /
Zuchara, Pawel Ul Malownicza 4 32-091 Michalowice / PL | 03 /
Gadek, Michal Ul. Bronowicka 69/64 30-091 Krakow / PL | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
Kalina, Andrzej Ul. Krzyszkowicka 4A 32-020, Wieliczka / PL | ||
02 /
Zuchara, Pawel Ul Malownicza 4 32-091, Michalowice / PL | |||
03 /
Gadek, Michal Ul. Bronowicka 69/64 30-091, Krakow / PL | Representative(s) | Robert, Vincent, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Robert, Vincent, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64, Avenue de la Plaine de France Paris Nord II BP 65059 Tremblay-en-France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07123157.5 | 13.12.2007 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2071172 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/08, B60K15/035, B01D53/04, B01D46/00, // B60R11/00 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
F02D15/02 (EP);
B01D53/0415 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2253/342 (EP);
B01D2257/702 (EP);
B01D2259/4516 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/08] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kanister mit umgossenem Filter | [2009/25] | English: | Canister with overmolded filter | [2009/25] | French: | Récipient doté d'un filtre surmoulé | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 18.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/23] | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time [2010/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1788230 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0020] - [0027]; figure - *; | [A]US2003101871 (SCARDINO EILEEN ALANNA [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0023] - [0027]; figures 1,2,4-6 *; | [A]EP1843034 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015]; figure 2 *; | [A]US6190432 (GIESEKE STEVEN SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 48 - line 56; figure 7 *; | [DA]US6390073 (MEILLER THOMAS CHARLES [US], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6390073 |