EP1935816 - Printing Medium Feeding Apparatus and Image Forming Apparatus having the Same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S-Printing Solution Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2017/12] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jin-soo Best Town Apt, 736-1701, 511 Cheoncheon-dong Jangan-gu,Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
KANG, Hoon Sinyeongtong Hyundai 2-cha Apt., 211-304, Banwol-dong, Gyeonggi-do Hwaseong-si / KR | [2016/21] |
Former [2008/26] | 01 /
LEE, Jin-soo Best Town Apt, 736-1701, 511 Cheoncheon-dong, Jan Suwon-si / KR | ||
02 /
KANG, Hoon Sinyeongtong Hyundai 2-cha Apt., 211-304, Banwol- Hwaseong-si / KR | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2016/21] |
Former [2008/26] | Waddington, Richard Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07123405.8 | 17.12.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | KR20060130387 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: KR 20060130387 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1935816 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1935816 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | [2009/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1935816 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/06, B65H9/00, B65H9/06 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
B65H9/06 (EP,US);
B41J13/02 (KR);
B41J11/00 (KR);
B65H5/062 (EP,US);
B65H9/004 (EP,US);
B65H2404/722 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/26] | B65H5/06, B65H9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2016/21] |
Former [2010/25] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckmedienzufuhrgerät und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung damit | [2008/26] | English: | Printing Medium Feeding Apparatus and Image Forming Apparatus having the Same | [2008/26] | French: | Appareil d'alimentation de support d'impression et appareil de formation d'images comportant celui-ci | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 15.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0782967 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1914599 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004028438 (SHIN SANG-YOB [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4921241 (LANDA BENZION [CA], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |