EP1894719 - Printing unit on a web-fed rotary printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schäfer, Karl Brückentorstr. 12 97273 Kürnach / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Georg Fritz-Haber-Str. 13 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Thomas Koenig & Bauer AG Lizenzen-Patente Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Hoffmann, Thomas Koenig & Bauer AG Lizenzen-Patente Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | Hoffmann, Thomas Koenig & Bauer AG Patentabteilung Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07123776.2 | 23.03.2005 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | DE20041017287 | 05.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004017287 | DE20041022704 | 05.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004022704 | DE20041037888 | 05.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004037888 | [2008/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1894719 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1894719 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1894719 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/20, B41F13/44, B41F13/008 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
B41F13/20 (EP,US);
B41F13/0024 (EP,US);
B41F13/004 (EP,US);
B41F13/008 (EP,US);
B41F13/30 (EP,US);
B41F13/40 (EP,US);
B41F13/44 (EP,US);
B41F31/302 (EP,US);
B41F7/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/28] | B41F13/20, B41F13/44, B41F13/24, B41F13/00, B41F31/30 | ||
Former IPC [2008/10] | B41F13/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Title | German: | Druckeinheit einer Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine | [2008/10] | English: | Printing unit on a web-fed rotary printing press | [2008/10] | French: | Unité d'impression d'une rotative à bobines | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 04.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05717142.3 / EP1732761 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050717142) is 21.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2005 | CY | 04.04.2012 | CZ | 04.04.2012 | DK | 04.04.2012 | EE | 04.04.2012 | FI | 04.04.2012 | IT | 04.04.2012 | LT | 04.04.2012 | NL | 04.04.2012 | PL | 04.04.2012 | RO | 04.04.2012 | SE | 04.04.2012 | SI | 04.04.2012 | SK | 04.04.2012 | TR | 04.04.2012 | BG | 04.07.2012 | GR | 05.07.2012 | ES | 15.07.2012 | IS | 04.08.2012 | PT | 06.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 04.04.2012 | |
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 04.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0638419 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * page 4, lines 6,7,12-14,27,28; figure 3; claims 1,2,5,6 * * page 3, lines 37-39 *; | [A]US5715749 (MILLER JOHN JARRETT [US]) [A] 1* column 2, lines 54-58; figures 2,5 *; | [A]US5782182 (RUCKMANN WOLFGANG GUENTHER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5809882 (RUCKMANN WOLFGANG GUENTER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 49-50; figures 2,3,4,5 *; | [A]US2004045462 (GOLDBURT MIKHAIL [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0026] , [0030] * | by applicant | US2557381 | US3470816 | DE2234089 | EP0246081 | WO9524314 | DE19534651 | WO9924260 | DE4327278 | EP0699524 | US2002112626 | DE10202385 | WO02081218 | EP1264686 | US6494138 | DE10145322 | WO03039872 | WO2004080717 |