EP1956728 - Method for controlling communication of radio terminal, and radio terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nibe, Keiji c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Fukushima, Kentaro c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
Nibe, Keiji c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Fukushima, Kentaro c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2016/20] |
Former [2008/33] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07123869.5 | 20.12.2007 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | JP20070030209 | 09.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007030209 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1956728 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1956728 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1956728 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/16, // H04W52/14, H04W52/28, H04W52/44 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
H04W52/16 (EP,US);
H04W52/146 (EP,US);
H04W52/286 (EP,US);
H04W52/44 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | H04W52/16, H04W52/32 | ||
Former IPC [2008/33] | H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2013/02] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kommunikationssteuerung eines Funkendgeräts und Funkendgerät | [2008/33] | English: | Method for controlling communication of radio terminal, and radio terminal | [2008/33] | French: | Procédé pour le contrôle de la communication d'un terminal radio et terminal radio | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 03.11.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1708524 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0091] *; | [Y]EP1564905 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0049] *; | [A]US2003100268 (MOULSLEY TIMOTHY J [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A]WO2006016775 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 2 * | by applicant | JP2007030209 | JP2005006293 |