EP2072447 - Load-bearing device for a lift installation, lift installation with such a load-bearing device, set of load-bearing members for such a load-bearing device and method for manufacturing such a load-bearing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Begle, Guntram Breitfeld 11 6403 Küssnacht a/Rigi / CH | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/17] |
Former [2009/26] | Blöchle, Hans, et al Inventio AG, Seestrasse 55, Postfach 6052 Hergiswil/NW / CH | Application number, filing date | 07123885.1 | 20.12.2007 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072447 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66B7/06 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
B66B7/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/09] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tragmittelanordnung für eine Aufzugsanlage, Aufzugsanlage mit einer solchen Tragmittelanordnung, Satz von Tragmitteln für eine solche Tragmittelanordnung und Herstellungsverfahren einer solchen Tragmittelanordnung | [2009/26] | English: | Load-bearing device for a lift installation, lift installation with such a load-bearing device, set of load-bearing members for such a load-bearing device and method for manufacturing such a load-bearing device | [2009/26] | French: | Agencement de moyens de portage pour une installation d'ascenseur, installation d'ascenseur dotée d'un tel agencement de moyens de portage, ensemble de moyens de portage pour une telle installation de moyens de portage et procédé de fabrication d'un tel agencement de moyens de portage | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1391413 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [X] 1-37 * column 4, lines 26-31 *; | [XA]EP1428927 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [X] 1-16,21-35 * figures 1-3 * [A] 17-20,37; | [XA]EP1795483 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-16,21-35 * column 6, lines 55-57; figures 2,3 * [A] 17,20,37 | by applicant | EP1325881 | WO2006005215 | EP1428927 |