EP1944341 - Diluent for a fluorine-containing silicone coating agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Company, Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Koichi Silicone-Electronics Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0224 / JP | 02 /
Kishita, Hirofumi Silicone-Electronics Material Research Center Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0224 / JP | [2011/42] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Koichi Silicone-Electronics Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0224 / JP | ||
02 /
Kishita, Hirofumi Silicone-Electronics Material Research Center Shin-Etsu Chem. Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0224 / JP | Representative(s) | Pistolesi, Roberto, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Pistolesi, Roberto, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Marina 6 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07123895.0 | 21.12.2007 | [2008/29] | Priority number, date | JP20060349704 | 26.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006349704 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1944341 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1944341 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1944341 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09D7/00, C09D183/08 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
C09D127/12 (KR);
C09D183/00 (KR,US);
C09D183/04 (KR);
C09D183/08 (EP,US);
C09D7/20 (EP,US);
C08L83/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | IT [2010/18] |
Former [2008/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verdünnungsmittel für ein fluorhaltiges Silikonbeschichtungsmittel | [2008/29] | English: | Diluent for a fluorine-containing silicone coating agent | [2008/29] | French: | Diluant pour agent de revêtement en silicone contenant du fluor | [2008/29] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004186225 (YAMAGUCHI KOICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0050] * * claims 1, 5 * * paragraph [0056] *; | [Y]EP0655483 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 4, line 23 - line 44 * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0608780 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 1, line 1 - page 12 * * page 4, line 14 - line 30 * | by applicant | JPH057434B | JPH0476391B | JPH0718185 |