EP1939003 - Image processing method and image processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, 1-chome Nakamagome, Ota-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawahara, Shinya Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6,Nakamagome 1-chome,Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Hotta, Yoshihiko Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6,Nakamagome 1-chome,Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Ishimi, Tomomi Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6,Nakamagome 1-chome,Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | Barz, Peter Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07124057.6 | 24.12.2007 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | JP20060349980 | 26.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006349980 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1939003 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1939003 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/475, B41J2/44, B41M5/30 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
B41J2/442 (EP,US);
B41J2/4753 (EP,US);
B41M5/305 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2009/11] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und Bildprozessor | [2008/27] | English: | Image processing method and image processor | [2008/27] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'images et processeur d'images | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2003127446 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD, et al) [Y] 3-6,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0026] - [0029] *; | [Y]US2005119122 (SAKATA YOSHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 7-9 * abstract ** paragraphs [0015] - [0019] - [0303] *; | [XY]EP1707382 (LINTEC CORP [JP]) [X] 2 * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0012] - [0016] - [0027] , [0029] - [0040] - [0042]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 3-11 | by applicant | JP2003127446 | US2005119122 | EP1707382 |