EP1962231 - Production method of electronic apparatus, production method of electronic equipment in which electronic apparatus is packaged, and production method of article in which electronic apparatus is mounted [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Hiroshi Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Kobae, Kenji Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Takeuchi, Shuichi Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07124166.5 | 28.12.2007 | [2008/35] | Priority number, date | JP20070043183 | 23.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007043183 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1962231 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1962231 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/077 (KR);
G06K19/0775 (EP,US);
H01L24/75 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01L24/90 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6677 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75252 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83096 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83192 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83855 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/83192, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83192, H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/73204 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00011, H01L2224/0401 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/44] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für eine elektronische Vorrichtung, Herstellungsverfahren für elektronische Geräte mit der darin enthaltenen elektronischen Vorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren für einen Gegenstand mit der darin montierten elektronischen Vorrichtung | [2008/35] | English: | Production method of electronic apparatus, production method of electronic equipment in which electronic apparatus is packaged, and production method of article in which electronic apparatus is mounted | [2008/35] | French: | Procédé de production d'appareil électronique, procédé de production d'équipement électronique dans lequel l'appareil électronique est emballé, et procédé de production d'article sur lequel l'appareil électronique est assemblé | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0951064 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0100] , [0105] , [0264] , [0265]; figures 19a-19d * [A] 5,7,9,11; | [XA]JP2001338946 (TORAY ENG CO LTD) [X] 1,2 [A] 5,9,10; | [XA]JP2003209138 (SONY CHEMICALS) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0009] - [0040] * [A] 5-7,9-11; | [XY]EP1742171 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0004] , [0072] , [0088] , [95140] , [0225] - [0231] - [0274]; figures 23-25,30 * [Y] 5-12; | [Y] - WANT R, "An introduction to RFID technology", IEEE PERVASIVE COMPUTING, (200601), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 25 - 33, XP002510139 [Y] 5-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MPRV.2006.2 | by applicant | JP2001156110 |