15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
03.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
26.12.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
16.05.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
17.01.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
11.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.09.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.05.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] |
31.05.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] |
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.10.2012 |
First examination report |
|
13.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
25.06.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
24.06.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.11.2009 |
Publication of search report |
published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] |
26.09.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |