EP1985919 - Surface-blasted steam generator parts or power plant components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems Europe GmbH Schifferstrasse 80 47059 Duisburg / DE | [2014/25] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Hitachi Power Europe GmbH Schifferstrasse 80 47059 Duisburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Martin Tempelhofer Str. 96 51375, Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Klauke, Friedrich Am Kleinen Rahm 74 40878, Ratingen / DE | [2014/08] |
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
Becker, Martin Tempelhofer Str. 96 51375, Leverkusen / DE | ||
02 /
Klauke, Friedrich Am Kleinen Rahm 74 40878, Ratingen / DE | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Kennedydamm 55/Roßstr. 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 07150101.9 | 19.12.2007 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | DE20061062348 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006062348 | [2008/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1985919 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1985919 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1985919 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B24C1/10, C21D6/00, C21D9/08, C21D7/06, F22B37/04 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
B24C1/10 (EP,US);
C21D6/002 (EP,US);
C21D7/06 (EP,US);
C21D9/08 (EP,US);
F22B37/04 (EP,US);
C21D2211/001 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/44] | F22B37/04, C21D7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | Oberflächengestrahlte Dampferzeugerbauteile oder Kraftwerkskomponenten | [2008/44] | English: | Surface-blasted steam generator parts or power plant components | [2008/44] | French: | Composants grenaillés d'une chaudière ou d'une centrale électrique | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 29.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.02.2014 | EE | 19.02.2014 | FI | 19.02.2014 | LT | 19.02.2014 | LV | 19.02.2014 | MC | 19.02.2014 | MT | 19.02.2014 | RO | 19.02.2014 | SE | 19.02.2014 | IS | 19.06.2014 | PT | 19.06.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/27] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.02.2014 | |
IS | 19.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1637785 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0038] * [Y] 1,2,5-8,13-15; | [X]FR2318229 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,12-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 11 *; | [E]EP2060641 (NKKTUBES [JP]) [E] 1,3-5,7-9,11-13,15,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0035] *; | [Y]US3648498 (VOSS RICHARD F, et al) [Y] 2,14 * page 3, line 4 - line 22 *; | [Y]EP0937782 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5-8,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03046242 (INTEGRAN TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [A] * the whole document * | [A] - QIURONG CHEN ET AL, "NEW BOILER AND PIPING MATERIALS DESIGN CONSIDERATION FOR ADVANCED CYCLE CONDITIONS//AUSLEGUNGSKRITERIEN NEUER KESSELUND ROHRIETUNGSWERKSTOFFE FUER FORTGESCHRITTENE DAMPFPARAMETER", VGB POWERTECH, VGB POWERTECH, ESSEN, DE, (20030101), vol. 83, no. 11, ISSN 1435-3199, pages 91 - 98, XP001185009 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - HUSEMANN R U ET AL, VERARBEITUNG UND BETRIEBSEINSATZ VON NEUEN WERKSTOFFEN IM KRAFTWERKSBAU, VGB KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK, VGB KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK GMBH. ESSEN, DE, PAGE(S) 265 - 279, (19950301), ISSN 0372-5715, XP000498095 [A] * the whole document * | Examination | JP2005298878 |