EP2073108 - Screen with capacitive tactile areas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EM Microelectronic-Marin SA Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamm, Alain Rue de Chemarin 17 2523 Lignières / CH | 02 /
Grosjacques, Emile Ruelle du Lac 4 2072 Saint-Blaise / CH | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2018/12] |
Former [2010/12] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2010/12] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2009/26] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 07150136.5 | 19.12.2007 | [2009/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2073108 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2073108 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/044 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/0445 (EP,US);
G06F3/0446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/12] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Touchscreen mit kapazitiven Berührungszonen | [2009/26] | English: | Screen with capacitive tactile areas | [2009/26] | French: | Ecran à zones tactiles capacitives | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2007 | AT | 21.03.2018 | CY | 21.03.2018 | CZ | 21.03.2018 | DK | 21.03.2018 | EE | 21.03.2018 | ES | 21.03.2018 | FI | 21.03.2018 | IT | 21.03.2018 | LT | 21.03.2018 | LV | 21.03.2018 | MC | 21.03.2018 | MT | 21.03.2018 | NL | 21.03.2018 | PL | 21.03.2018 | RO | 21.03.2018 | SE | 21.03.2018 | SI | 21.03.2018 | SK | 21.03.2018 | TR | 21.03.2018 | BG | 21.06.2018 | GR | 22.06.2018 | IS | 21.07.2018 | PT | 23.07.2018 | GB | 19.12.2018 | IE | 19.12.2018 | LU | 19.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.12.2007 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
GB | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
GB | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
GB | 19.12.2018 | ||
IE | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 19.12.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MT | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO2006007071 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1,7,9-12 * page 2, line 9 - page 7, line 5; figures 1,2 * [A] 5,8 [Y] 1,2,5-7,10; | [XAY]WO2006028131 (GUNZE CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 * the whole document * * figures 9,10 * [A] 10-12 [Y] 5-7,10; | EP1870799 [ ] (GUNZE CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0058] - [0086]; figures 9,10 *; | [Y]US2006001655 (TANABE KOJI [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0035] - [0040]; figures 1-7 *; | [XA]EP1840714 (APPLE COMPUTER [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0016] - [0024]; figures 1-5B * [A] 6,8; | [Y]WO2004046905 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [Y] 1,2,6 * page 3, line 22 - page 5, line 22; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005126831 (RICHTER PAUL J [US], et al) [Y] 7,10 * paragraphs [0028] - [0080]; figures 1-7 * |