EP2072765 - Apparatus for pressure adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Turbo Systems AG Bruggerstrasse 71a 5400 Baden / CH | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Christof Lettenstrasse 24 DE-79804, Dogern / DE | 02 /
Schumm, Manfred Marktgasse 19 CH-5304, Endingen / CH | 03 /
Bothien, Mihajlo-Rüdiger Alpenblickstrasse 15 DE-79761, Waldshut-Tiengen / DE | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 07150348.6 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072765 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/18, F02C6/12 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
F01D25/00 (EP);
F01D25/183 (EP);
F02B37/16 (EP);
F02B39/14 (EP);
F05D2220/40 (EP);
F05D2260/6022 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/09] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Druckanpassung | [2009/26] | English: | Apparatus for pressure adjustment | [2009/26] | French: | Dispositif d'adaptation de la pression | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2126663 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1 * page 3, lines 22-37; figure 2 * [Y] 2-5; | [Y]EP0606965 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [Y] 2-5 * page 3, lines 9-26; figure 1 *; | [X]JPS5970830 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1394365 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] *; | [A]DE1236856 (SCHWITZER CORP) [A] 1-6 * column 5, lines 34-60 * * column 6, lines 14-56; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0718541 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 39; figures 1,5 * * column 6, lines 14-31 *; | [A]EP1510658 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] * |