EP1944322 - Treatment of TNF alpha related disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd Clarendon House 2, Church Street HM 11 Hamilton / BM | [2013/38] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Abbott Biotechnology Ltd. Clarendon House 2 Church Street Hamilton HM 11 / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banerjee, Subhashis 77 Dunbar Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | 02 /
Taylor, Lori K. 14576 West Crabapple Drive Wadsworth, IL 60083 / US | 03 /
Spiegler, Clive E. 70 Pepper Road Emmer Green Reading BERKS RG4 8TL / GB | 04 /
Tracey, Daniel, Edward 149 Shaker Road Harvard, MS 01451 / US | 05 /
Chartash, Eliot, Keith 28 Edinburgh Drive Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | 06 /
Hoffman, Rebecca S. 1300 Elmwood Avenue Wilmette, IL 60091 / US | 07 /
Barchuk, William T. 95 Madison Avenue, Apt. 1 Madison, NJ 07940 / US | 08 /
Yan, Philip 368 Old Creek Road Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | 09 /
Murtaza, Anwar 30 Treetop Park Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 10 /
Salfeld, Jochen, G. 177 Old Westboro Road North Grafton, MA 01536 / US | 11 /
Fischkoff, Steven 5 Canoe Brook Road Short Hills, NJ 07078 / US | [2008/34] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
Banerjee, Subhashis 77 Dunbar Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | ||
02 /
Taylor, Lori K. 14576 West Crabapple Drive Wadsworth, IL 60083 / US | |||
03 /
Spiegler, Clive E. 70 Pepper Road Emmer Green, Reading, BERKS RG4 8TL / GB | |||
04 /
Tracey, Daniel, Edward 149 Shaker Road Harvard, MS 01451 / US | |||
05 /
Chartash, Eliot, Keith 28 Edinburgh Drive Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | |||
06 /
Hoffman, Rebecca S. 1300 Elmwood Avenue Wilmette, IL 60091 / US | |||
07 /
Barchuk, William T. 95 Madison Avenue, Apt. 1 Madison, NJ 07940 / US | |||
08 /
Yan, Philip 368 Old Creek Road Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | |||
09 /
Murtaza, Anwar 30 Treetop Park Westborough, MA 01581 / US | |||
10 /
Salfeld, Jochen, G. 177 Old Westboro Road North Grafton, MA 01536 / US | |||
11 /
Fischkoff, Steven 5 Canoe Brook Road Short Hills, NJ 07078 / US | Representative(s) | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07150442.7 | 18.07.2003 | [2008/29] | Priority number, date | US20020397275P | 19.07.2002 Original published format: US 397275 P | US20020411081P | 16.09.2002 Original published format: US 411081 P | US20020417490P | 10.10.2002 Original published format: US 417490 P | US20030455777P | 18.03.2003 Original published format: US 455777 P | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1944322 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1944322 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1944322 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24, A61K39/395 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
C07K16/241 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP,KR);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP,KR);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP,KR);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP,KR);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K16/00 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2299/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/54 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | Behandlung von Erkrankungen im Zusammenhang mit TNF-alpha | [2008/29] | English: | Treatment of TNF alpha related disorders | [2008/29] | French: | Traitement des troubles associés au TND alpha | [2008/29] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2012 | Observations by third parties | 01.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2013 | Observations by third parties | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2013 | Observations by third parties | 18.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2014 | Observations by third parties | 28.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2014 | Observations by third parties | 21.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03748949.9 / EP1542720 | Divisional application(s) | EP10182274.0 / EP2336182 | EP10182730.1 / EP2371859 | EP10183702.9 / EP2298810 | EP15157149.4 / EP2942359 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030748949) is 30.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | 03
09.12.2015
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | 04
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Station Close Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 05
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | 06
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | 07
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pharmaceutical Works Polpharma SA Pelplinska 19 83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 08
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 09
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE Opponent's representative Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | 10
11.12.2015
16.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US Opponent's representative Royle, Matthew Charles James Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | 11
11.12.2015
23.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pajaro Limited 90 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1EQ / GB Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | 12
10.12.2015
17.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Breuer, Markus Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 23 80636 München / DE | 13
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE KILBURN & STRODE LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
03
09.12.2015
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
04
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Station Close Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
05
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
06
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
07
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pharmaceutical Works Polpharma SA Pelplinska 19 83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
08
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
09
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE Opponent's representative Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | |||
10
11.12.2015
16.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US Opponent's representative Royle, Matthew Charles James Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | |||
11
11.12.2015
23.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pajaro Limited 90 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1EQ / GB Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
12
10.12.2015
17.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Breuer, Markus Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 23 80636 München / DE | |||
13
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE KILBURN & STRODE LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
03
09.12.2015
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB Opponent's representative Bassett, Richard Simon Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
04
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Station Close Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
05
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
06
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
07
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pharmaceutical Works Polpharma SA Pelplinska 19 83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
08
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
09
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE Opponent's representative Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | |||
10
11.12.2015
16.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US Opponent's representative Royle, Matthew Charles James Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | |||
11
11.12.2015
23.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pajaro Limited 90 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1EQ / GB Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
12
10.12.2015
17.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Breuer, Markus Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 23 80636 München / DE | |||
13
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE KILBURN & STRODE LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
03
09.12.2015
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB Opponent's representative Bassett, Richard Simon Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
04
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Station Close Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
05
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
06
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
07
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pharmaceutical Works Polpharma SA Pelplinska 19 83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
08
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
09
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE Opponent's representative Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | |||
10
11.12.2015
16.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US Opponent's representative Royle, Matthew Charles James Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | |||
11
11.12.2015
Pajaro Limited 90 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1EQ / GB Opponent's representative Kinkeldey, Daniela Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
12
10.12.2015
17.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Breuer, Markus Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 23 80636 München / DE | |||
13
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE KILBURN & STRODE LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
03
09.12.2015
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB Opponent's representative Bassett, Richard Simon Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
04
09.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Station Close Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
05
09.12.2015
Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR | |||
Former [2015/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE KILBURN & STRODE LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
Former [2015/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 19.01.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.08.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.12.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.03.2015 | LI | 11.03.2015 | [2017/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9216553 (UNIV NEW YORK [US], et al); | [A]EP0614984 (MILES INC [US]); | [X]WO9729131 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | Examination | WO02100330 | by applicant | US4399216 | US4510245 | EP0154316 | US4634665 | US4816397 | US4968615 | EP0401384 | WO9103553 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9209690 | WO9215679 | WO9218619 | WO9220791 | US5168062 | US5179017 | WO9301288 | US5223409 | US5231024 | EP0260610 | WO9319751 | WO9406476 | US5656272 | US6090382 | US6258562 | WO02072636 | US6509015 | US2003092059 | US2003219438 | other | WO02100330 | Opposition | WO02100330 | WO2004009776 | EP1944322 |