Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008150490 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A3 | WO2008150490 | 11.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US12849808 | 22.05.2008 | US2412208 | 28.01.2008 | US93291407 | 01.06.2007 | US1153808 | 17.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008063213 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A3 | WO2008063213 | 29.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008005315 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2009 | A8 | WO2008005315 | 13.11.2008 | A3 | WO2008005315 | 13.03.2008 | A9 | WO2008005315 | 10.01.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007120823 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2008 | A3 | WO2007120823 | 25.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US84012206 | 25.08.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US81789106 | 29.06.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007120720 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2007 | A3 | WO2007120720 | 25.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US90463707 | 01.03.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US80285806 | 22.05.2006 | US80261606 | 22.05.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007120656 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2009 | A3 | WO2007120656 | 25.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US90242707 | 21.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007120651 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2008 | A3 | WO2007120651 | 25.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007120626 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2008 | A3 | WO2007120626 | 25.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006125229 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2009 | A3 | WO2006125229 | 22.02.2007 | A8 | WO2006125229 | 23.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005110452 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2006 | A3 | WO2005110452 | 24.11.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004037205 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2005 | A8 | WO2004037205 | 28.10.2004 | A3 | WO2004037205 | 06.05.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021347875 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213433205 | 28.03.2012 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US202017125275 | 17.12.2020 | US806408 | 07.01.2008 | US80458707 | 17.05.2007 | US80158406 | 17.05.2006 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US201514745092 | 19.06.2015 | US201815915615 | 08.03.2018 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021347874 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514804164 | 20.07.2015 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201916284798 | 25.02.2019 | US201414229664 | 28.03.2014 | US202017124991 | 17.12.2020 | US201514628068 | 20.02.2015 | US201615288750 | 07.10.2016 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020017580 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514804164 | 20.07.2015 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201916284798 | 25.02.2019 | US201414229664 | 28.03.2014 | US201514628068 | 20.02.2015 | US201615288750 | 07.10.2016 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019062418 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514681704 | 08.04.2015 | US201414266598 | 30.04.2014 | US201414563056 | 08.12.2014 | US201514809828 | 27.07.2015 | US201414228791 | 28.03.2014 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | US201414510821 | 09.10.2014 | US201815920987 | 14.03.2018 | US43584406 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019055308 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213433205 | 28.03.2012 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US201514745092 | 19.06.2015 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201815915615 | 08.03.2018 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | US806408 | 07.01.2008 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US80458707 | 17.05.2007 | US80158406 | 17.05.2006 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019040124 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US78646107 | 10.04.2007 | US81851007 | 13.06.2007 | US1278708 | 04.02.2008 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US201615062992 | 07.03.2016 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US201815907921 | 28.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018044414 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12849808 | 22.05.2008 | US13083108 | 30.05.2008 | US88043307 | 20.07.2007 | US85735206 | 06.11.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US85918110 | 18.08.2010 | US2412208 | 28.01.2008 | US93291407 | 01.06.2007 | US83237006 | 20.07.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US78644507 | 10.04.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US84012206 | 25.08.2006 | US64689109 | 23.12.2009 | US1153808 | 17.01.2008 | US85183006 | 12.10.2006 | US35250309 | 12.01.2009 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US81789106 | 29.06.2006 | US84967106 | 04.10.2006 | US201715470468 | 27.03.2017 | US40240809 | 11.03.2009 | US14060608 | 23.12.2008 | US18344609 | 02.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017210795 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US201715487357 | 13.04.2017 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US78645907 | 10.04.2007 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017203041 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US201113267467 | 06.10.2011 | US7470408 | 05.03.2008 | US201715434844 | 16.02.2017 | US82451607 | 29.06.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US201414170045 | 31.01.2014 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | US201514935085 | 06.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017157249 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US78644207 | 10.04.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US201615216328 | 21.07.2016 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US90242707 | 21.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017044249 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213433205 | 28.03.2012 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US201514745092 | 19.06.2015 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | US806408 | 07.01.2008 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US80458707 | 17.05.2007 | US80158406 | 17.05.2006 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017022271 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514804164 | 20.07.2015 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201414229664 | 28.03.2014 | US201514628068 | 20.02.2015 | US201615288750 | 07.10.2016 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016297879 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81231206 | 08.06.2006 | US201514944891 | 18.11.2015 | US81114107 | 08.06.2007 | US85832806 | 10.11.2006 | US201314010172 | 26.08.2013 | US85183006 | 12.10.2006 | US83237006 | 20.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016280776 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US81187307 | 11.06.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US201514935991 | 09.11.2015 | US79373706 | 19.04.2006 | US78831207 | 19.04.2007 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US78605307 | 10.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9512216 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2016 | B2 | US2016272704 | 22.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514681704 | 08.04.2015 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US201414266598 | 30.04.2014 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201414563056 | 08.12.2014 | US201514809828 | 27.07.2015 | US201414228791 | 28.03.2014 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US43584406 | 16.05.2006 | US201615173191 | 03.06.2016 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016251424 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US78646107 | 10.04.2007 | US81851007 | 13.06.2007 | US1278708 | 04.02.2008 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US201615062992 | 07.03.2016 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016200809 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US78644507 | 10.04.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US84012206 | 25.08.2006 | US88043307 | 20.07.2007 | US85735206 | 06.11.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US85183006 | 12.10.2006 | US201514828084 | 17.08.2015 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US81789106 | 29.06.2006 | US84967106 | 04.10.2006 | US40240809 | 11.03.2009 | US83237006 | 20.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9499615 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2016 | B2 | US2016185849 | 30.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514804164 | 20.07.2015 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201414229664 | 28.03.2014 | US201514628068 | 20.02.2015 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016376360 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2016 | A9 | US2016176957 | 23.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514681704 | 08.04.2015 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US201414266598 | 30.04.2014 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201414563056 | 08.12.2014 | US201514809828 | 27.07.2015 | US201414228791 | 28.03.2014 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US43584406 | 16.05.2006 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9486584 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2016 | B2 | US2016089495 | 31.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US201414170045 | 31.01.2014 | US201113267467 | 06.10.2011 | US7470408 | 05.03.2008 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | US82451607 | 29.06.2007 | US201514935085 | 06.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015368335 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US201514844578 | 03.09.2015 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | US62293203 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015218269 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2015 | A1 | US9085620 | 21.07.2015 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US201514681713 | 08.04.2015 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | US43584406 | 16.05.2006 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US201414266598 | 30.04.2014 | US201414563056 | 08.12.2014 | US201414228791 | 28.03.2014 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US62293203 | 18.07.2003 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015218268 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2015 | A1 | US9090689 | 28.07.2015 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | US43584406 | 16.05.2006 | US201514681704 | 08.04.2015 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US201414266598 | 30.04.2014 | US201414563056 | 08.12.2014 | US201414228791 | 28.03.2014 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US62293203 | 18.07.2003 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9187559 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2015 | B2 | US2015175690 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201414229664 | 28.03.2014 | US201514628068 | 20.02.2015 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9067992 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2015 | B2 | US2015086569 | 26.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414266598 | 30.04.2014 | US201414563056 | 08.12.2014 | US201414228791 | 28.03.2014 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | US43584406 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8986693 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2015 | B1 | US2015071938 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US201414266598 | 30.04.2014 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201414228791 | 28.03.2014 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | US201414510821 | 09.10.2014 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US43584406 | 16.05.2006 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015064195 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US78644207 | 10.04.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US201414526448 | 28.10.2014 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US90242707 | 21.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015064194 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US78644207 | 10.04.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US201414526438 | 28.10.2014 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US90242707 | 21.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015056212 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US78644207 | 10.04.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US90242707 | 21.02.2007 | US201414526445 | 28.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015050216 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US78644507 | 10.04.2007 | US201414326061 | 08.07.2014 | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US84012206 | 25.08.2006 | US88043307 | 20.07.2007 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US85735206 | 06.11.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | US85183006 | 12.10.2006 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US81789106 | 29.06.2006 | US84967106 | 04.10.2006 | US40240809 | 11.03.2009 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US83237006 | 20.07.2006 | US62293203 | 18.07.2003 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015037772 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US201414170045 | 31.01.2014 | US201113267467 | 06.10.2011 | US7470408 | 05.03.2008 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | US82451607 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8926975 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2015 | B2 | US2014328855 | 06.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414306658 | 17.06.2014 | US81135507 | 08.06.2007 | US81231206 | 08.06.2006 | US85832806 | 10.11.2006 | US85735206 | 06.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014286941 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US62331803 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | US201414268628 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014286940 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US62331803 | 18.07.2003 | US201414268614 | 02.05.2014 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014286939 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US62331803 | 18.07.2003 | US201414268449 | 02.05.2014 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8906373 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2014 | B2 | US2014286867 | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | US43584406 | 16.05.2006 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US201414266598 | 30.04.2014 | US201414228791 | 28.03.2014 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US62293203 | 18.07.2003 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8961973 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2015 | B2 | US2014255396 | 11.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201414229664 | 28.03.2014 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8961974 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2015 | B2 | US2014248277 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201414229722 | 28.03.2014 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014248276 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | US201414229703 | 28.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014248275 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US201414229602 | 28.03.2014 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014248215 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81231206 | 08.06.2006 | US81114107 | 08.06.2007 | US85832806 | 10.11.2006 | US201314010172 | 26.08.2013 | US85183006 | 12.10.2006 | US83237006 | 20.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014234222 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2014 | A1 | US8808700 | 19.08.2014 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201414228791 | 28.03.2014 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | US43584406 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014212430 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414229709 | 28.03.2014 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014200332 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69323303 | 24.10.2003 | US201414183845 | 19.02.2014 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013243786 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US62331803 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013243763 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US201313903525 | 28.05.2013 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | US62293203 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9061005 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2015 | B2 | US2013122011 | 16.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213433205 | 28.03.2012 | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | US806408 | 07.01.2008 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US80458707 | 17.05.2007 | US80158406 | 17.05.2006 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012282262 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12849808 | 22.05.2008 | US13083108 | 30.05.2008 | US2412208 | 28.01.2008 | US35250309 | 12.01.2009 | US201213346215 | 09.01.2012 | US93291407 | 01.06.2007 | US1153808 | 17.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012171123 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113280613 | 25.10.2011 | US78874007 | 19.04.2007 | US79373706 | 19.04.2006 | US80053107 | 04.05.2007 | US81270506 | 08.06.2006 | US79814906 | 04.05.2006 | US85832806 | 10.11.2006 | US87275306 | 04.12.2006 | US85735206 | 06.11.2006 | US80158406 | 17.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9572938 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2017 | B2 | US2012107783 | 03.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US201113267467 | 06.10.2011 | US7470408 | 05.03.2008 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | US82451607 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9605064 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2017 | B2 | US2011171227 | 14.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US78644507 | 10.04.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US12849808 | 22.05.2008 | US13083108 | 30.05.2008 | US84012206 | 25.08.2006 | US64689109 | 23.12.2009 | US88043307 | 20.07.2007 | US85735206 | 06.11.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US1153808 | 17.01.2008 | US85918110 | 18.08.2010 | US85183006 | 12.10.2006 | US2412208 | 28.01.2008 | US35250309 | 12.01.2009 | US93291407 | 01.06.2007 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US81789106 | 29.06.2006 | US84967106 | 04.10.2006 | US40240809 | 11.03.2009 | US14060608 | 23.12.2008 | US83237006 | 20.07.2006 | US18344609 | 02.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8679061 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2014 | B2 | US2010160894 | 24.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US7470408 | 05.03.2008 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | US82451607 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010021451 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81135507 | 08.06.2007 | US81231206 | 08.06.2006 | US85832806 | 10.11.2006 | US85735206 | 06.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010003243 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US12849808 | 22.05.2008 | US13083108 | 30.05.2008 | US2412208 | 28.01.2008 | US35250309 | 12.01.2009 | US93291407 | 01.06.2007 | US1153808 | 17.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009317399 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78644407 | 10.04.2007 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US90463707 | 01.03.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US80285806 | 22.05.2006 | US80261606 | 22.05.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | US80472507 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009304682 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | US806408 | 07.01.2008 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US80458707 | 17.05.2007 | US80158406 | 17.05.2006 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009280065 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US78644507 | 10.04.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US84012206 | 25.08.2006 | US88043307 | 20.07.2007 | US85735206 | 06.11.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US85183006 | 12.10.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US81789106 | 29.06.2006 | US84967106 | 04.10.2006 | US40240809 | 11.03.2009 | US83237006 | 20.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9279015 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2016 | B2 | US2009123378 | 14.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US78646107 | 10.04.2007 | US81851007 | 13.06.2007 | US1278708 | 04.02.2008 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9624295 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2017 | B2 | US2009028794 | 29.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US78645907 | 10.04.2007 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008311043 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81231206 | 08.06.2006 | US81114107 | 08.06.2007 | US85832806 | 10.11.2006 | US85183006 | 12.10.2006 | US83237006 | 20.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008193466 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US10268208 | 14.04.2008 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US62307503 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9399061 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2016 | B2 | US2008166348 | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US78644207 | 10.04.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US90242707 | 21.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008131374 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78874007 | 19.04.2007 | US79373706 | 19.04.2006 | US80053107 | 04.05.2007 | US81270506 | 08.06.2006 | US79814906 | 04.05.2006 | US85832806 | 10.11.2006 | US87275306 | 04.12.2006 | US85735206 | 06.11.2006 | US80158406 | 17.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008118496 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US81187307 | 11.06.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US79373706 | 19.04.2006 | US78831207 | 19.04.2007 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US78605307 | 10.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007202104 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US62303903 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8715664 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2014 | B2 | US2007071747 | 29.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | US43584406 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8889136 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2014 | B2 | US2006009385 | 12.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10411705 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004219142 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US62220503 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8846046 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2014 | B2 | US2004166111 | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US69323303 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004151722 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US62292803 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004136991 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US62307503 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004136990 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US62303503 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004136989 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US62221003 | 18.07.2003 | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004131614 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US62307603 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004126373 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | US62306503 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004126372 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | US62293203 | 18.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190039349 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180094148 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170143008 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170036138 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160079933 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150055116 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150043568 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140117697 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140058649 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130086254 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130001318 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20120013443 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110000757 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050083805 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101636446B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2016 | B1 | KR20130108477 | 02.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101465456B | Global Dossier | 27.11.2014 | B1 | KR20080011665 | 05.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101440795B | Global Dossier | 22.09.2014 | B1 | KR20120112503 | 11.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101396797B | Global Dossier | 26.05.2014 | B1 | KR20090025305 | 10.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101378873B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2014 | B1 | KR20120137421 | 20.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101283877B | Global Dossier | 08.07.2013 | B1 | KR20120034749 | 12.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101282801B | Global Dossier | 15.07.2013 | B1 | KR20070012701 | 26.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017197547 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017185255 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016155801 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6133949B | Global Dossier | 24.05.2017 | B2 | JP2016039906 | 24.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015157821 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015142747 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015028040 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6145434B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2017 | B2 | JP2015013869 | 22.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5913422B | Global Dossier | 11.05.2016 | B2 | JP2014208026 | 06.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5758860B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2015 | B2 | JP2013034869 | 21.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012211138 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012046524 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5676386B | Global Dossier | 25.02.2015 | B2 | JP2012021001 | 02.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5535623B | Global Dossier | 02.07.2014 | B2 | JP2009542334 | 03.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5757495B | Global Dossier | 29.07.2015 | B2 | JP2008545662 | 18.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5748317B | Global Dossier | 15.07.2015 | B2 | JP2008502596 | 31.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5594803B | Global Dossier | 24.09.2014 | B2 | JP2006507286 | 02.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006506465 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL221301 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL221300 | Global Dossier | 29.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL220192 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL215312 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL210091 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2942359 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | EP07150442 | 18.07.2003 | EP03748949 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2708242 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2014 | A3 | EP2708242 | 19.03.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | EP07755151 | 10.04.2007 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2703010 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2014 | A3 | EP2703010 | 05.03.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | EP07755190 | 10.04.2007 | US90242707 | 21.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2666480 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2014 | A3 | EP2666480 | 27.11.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US90463707 | 01.03.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US80285806 | 22.05.2006 | EP07755288 | 10.04.2007 | US80261606 | 22.05.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US08962 | 10.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2666479 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2014 | A3 | EP2666479 | 27.11.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | EP07755184 | 10.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2666478 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2014 | A3 | EP2666478 | 27.11.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | EP07755413 | 10.04.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US84012206 | 25.08.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US81789106 | 29.06.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2666472 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2014 | A3 | EP2666472 | 27.11.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07870661 | 10.04.2007 | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | WO2007US08820 | 10.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2500037 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2012 | A3 | EP2500037 | 19.09.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP06770998 | 16.05.2006 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2371859 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2011 | A3 | EP2371859 | 05.10.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | EP07150442 | 18.07.2003 | EP03748949 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2338516 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2011 | A3 | EP2338516 | 29.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05777317 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2336182 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | EP07150442 | 18.07.2003 | EP03748949 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2335732 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2011 | A3 | EP2335732 | 22.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05777317 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2335731 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2011 | A3 | EP2335731 | 22.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05777317 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2332565 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03809644 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2298810 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2011 | A3 | EP2298810 | 23.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | EP07150442 | 18.07.2003 | EP03748949 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2295071 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03809644 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2152318 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2011 | A4 | EP2152318 | 17.02.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US12849808 | 22.05.2008 | US2412208 | 28.01.2008 | US93291407 | 01.06.2007 | US1153808 | 17.01.2008 | WO2008US06910 | 30.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2043711 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2017 | A4 | EP2043711 | 08.04.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2012824 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2010 | A4 | EP2012824 | 14.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US84012206 | 25.08.2006 | WO2007US09131 | 10.04.2007 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US81789106 | 29.06.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2012586 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2010 | A4 | EP2012586 | 14.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | WO2007US08787 | 10.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2010215 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2010 | A4 | EP2010215 | 07.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US90463707 | 01.03.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US80285806 | 22.05.2006 | US80261606 | 22.05.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US08962 | 10.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2010214 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2010 | A4 | EP2010214 | 07.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | WO2007US08833 | 10.04.2007 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | US90242707 | 21.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2010213 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2010 | A4 | EP2010213 | 07.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | WO2007US08826 | 10.04.2007 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2007426 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2010 | A4 | EP2007426 | 31.12.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US85837606 | 10.11.2006 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US90968307 | 02.04.2007 | WO2007US08820 | 10.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1885397 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2010 | A4 | EP1885397 | 13.02.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1737491 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2016 | B1 | EP1737491 | 04.06.2008 | A4 | EP1737491 | 03.01.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578439 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2011 | B1 | EP1578439 | 26.04.2006 | A4 | EP1578439 | 28.09.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1542720 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2006 | A4 | EP1542720 | 22.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2950817 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2018 | C | CA2950817 | 10.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | CA2885759 | 29.06.2007 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2898009 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | C | CA2898009 | 23.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2608728 | 16.05.2006 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2504868 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2016 | C | CA2504868 | 26.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017268678 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2017268678 | 01.12.2017 | AU2013204147 | 12.04.2013 | AU2015215873 | 19.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016256831B | Global Dossier | 21.02.2019 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | AU2006246721 | 16.05.2006 | AU2012254978 | 19.11.2012 | AU2016256831 | 11.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015215873 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2015 | A8 | AU2015215873 | 10.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2013204147 | 12.04.2013 | AU2015215873 | 19.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013204153 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2012203853 | 29.06.2012 | AU2013204153 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013204147B | Global Dossier | 03.09.2015 | B2 | AU2013204147 | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2012203853 | 29.06.2012 | AU2013204147 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012258373 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2010206042 | 29.07.2010 | AU2012258373 | 23.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012254978C | Global Dossier | 01.06.2017 | C1 | AU2012254978B | 11.08.2016 | B2 | AU2012254978 | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | AU2006246721 | 16.05.2006 | AU2012254978 | 19.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012203853B | Global Dossier | 03.09.2015 | B2 | AU2012203853 | 19.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2010200708 | 25.02.2010 | AU2012203853 | 29.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010206042B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2012 | B2 | AU2010206042 | 19.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2003301522 | 24.10.2003 | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | AU2010206042 | 29.07.2010 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010200708B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2012 | B2 | AU2010200708 | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2010200708 | 25.02.2010 | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | AU2003267999 | 18.07.2003 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007269791B | Global Dossier | 03.10.2013 | B2 | AU2007269791 | 10.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006246721B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2012 | B2 | AU2006246721 | 23.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005244261B | Global Dossier | 22.09.2011 | B2 | AU2005244261 | 24.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003301522B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2010 | B8 | AU2003301522B | 08.07.2010 | B2 | AU2003301522 | 13.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003267999B | Global Dossier | 11.03.2010 | B2 | AU2003267999 | 09.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1944322 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2015 | B1 | EP1944322 | 17.12.2008 | A3 | EP1944322 | 16.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | EP03748949 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR045710 | 09.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR077573 | 07.09.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR098173 | 04.05.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE517632T | 15.08.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0312785 | 30.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0315597 | 06.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0509326 | 04.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0610058 | 25.05.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0713802 | 06.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2493067 | 29.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2497909 | 06.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2564435 | 10.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US90463707 | 01.03.2007 | US79090906 | 10.04.2006 | US80285806 | 22.05.2006 | US80261606 | 22.05.2006 | US81548906 | 20.06.2006 | US80977006 | 30.05.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US08962 | 10.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2608728 | 23.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2651992 | 10.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2800126 | 29.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | CA2493067 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2803741 | 29.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | CA2493067 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2847142 | 07.04.2015 | C | CA2847142 | 26.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | CA2504868 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2847331 | 26.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | CA2504868 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2880296 | 29.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | CA2493067 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2885759 | 10.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | CA2651992 | 29.06.2007 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2890586 | 29.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2800126 | 18.07.2003 | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2903138 | 23.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | CA2898009 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2970891 | 26.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | CA2847331 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101484199B | 25.06.2014 | B | CN101484199 | 15.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101500607B | 27.11.2013 | B | CN101500607 | 05.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102614512 | 01.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102961746B | 15.06.2016 | B | CN102961746 | 13.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103203019 | 17.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103251945 | 21.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103316402 | 25.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103316403B | 24.05.2017 | B | CN103316403 | 25.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | CN200780024818 | 29.06.2007 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103623408 | 12.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105106951 | 02.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | CN200580019165 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105148273 | 16.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | CN200580019165 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107243099 | 13.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | CN200780024818 | 29.06.2007 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1691963 | 02.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1732015 | 08.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1988918 | 27.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1113524T | 22.06.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP03809644 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1116323T | 08.02.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | EP07150442 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1118564T | 12.07.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1578439T | 31.10.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1737491T | 06.02.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1944322T | 22.06.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | EP03748949 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2370351T | 14.12.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2611286T | 04.08.2021 | T8 | ES2611286T | 08.05.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1104454 | 18.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1133397 | 26.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE031558T | 28.07.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL166280 | 30.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL178430 | 24.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL195235 | 28.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT1737491T | 27.12.2016 | T | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007014440 | 11.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | WO2006US19982 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008016335 | 21.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX342777 | 12.10.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05000815 | 28.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05004344 | 02.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA06011677 | 23.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY150740 | 28.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ539332 | 30.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ549959 | 28.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ572765 | 31.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ579302 | 27.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ585493 | 27.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ587754 | 27.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | NZ57677409 | 06.05.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ591362 | 26.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ57930205 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ591701 | 30.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ595225 | 31.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ595605 | 31.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | NZ57276507 | 29.06.2007 | NZ59560511 | 06.10.2011 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ596945 | 28.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ58549303 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ598346 | 25.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | NZ58775403 | 18.07.2003 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ608319 | 29.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | NZ59522506 | 16.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ608925 | 31.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | NZ59560511 | 06.10.2011 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ627177 | 26.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ60831906 | 16.05.2006 | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ701052 | 29.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | NZ60892507 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20040751 | 18.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1737491T | 31.05.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP05777317 | 11.04.2005 | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL213215B | 31.01.2013 | B1 | PL376705 | 09.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL398520 | 04.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1578439E | 19.10.2011 | E | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1737491T | 31.01.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2438721 | 10.01.2012 | C2 | RU2009102986 | 10.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2011137704 | 20.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2015135983 | 03.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA04240497 | 03.12.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201500745P | 29.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | SG2008094500 | 29.06.2007 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG173339 | 29.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1578439T | 30.12.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0333973 | 24.10.2003 | EP03809644 | 24.10.2003 | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1944322T | 30.06.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | EP07150442 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI361696B | 11.04.2012 | B | TW200412999 | 01.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI399383B | 21.06.2013 | B | TW200716673 | 01.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI498137B | 01.09.2015 | B | TW200819154 | 01.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI399384B | 21.06.2013 | B | TW201100446 | 01.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US68164505 | 16.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI423817B | 21.01.2014 | B | TW201119679 | 16.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201206478 | 16.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201345552 | 16.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI542374B | 21.07.2016 | B | TW201406419 | 16.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI527603B | 01.04.2016 | B | TW201406420 | 16.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI556829B | 11.11.2016 | B | TW201422239 | 16.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201705980 | 16.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI439284B | 01.06.2014 | B | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UY28041 | 31.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200500068 | 25.01.2006 | B | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US0322566 | 18.07.2003 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200502983 | 27.09.2006 | B | Priority number | Date | US42126202 | 24.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200608097 | 30.04.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | US56113904 | 09.04.2004 | WO2005US12007 | 11.04.2005 | US56171004 | 12.04.2004 | US56910004 | 07.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200810349 | 24.11.2010 | B | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | WO2007US15095 | 29.06.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201006269 | 26.06.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | US81784906 | 30.06.2006 | US90462607 | 01.03.2007 | US89926207 | 02.02.2007 | US83890506 | 18.08.2006 | US81823106 | 30.06.2006 | US84996706 | 06.10.2006 | US91817407 | 14.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004009776 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2004 | A3 | WO2004009776 | 29.01.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110027851 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050042466 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015221798 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013056892 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010209070 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR040603 | 13.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR077474 | 31.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101745112 | 23.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102755646 | 31.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102764436 | 07.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2535365T | 08.05.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1121463 | 24.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1215265 | 19.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY151032 | 31.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY169308 | 21.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ555692 | 28.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ563452 | 30.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ576774 | 30.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL213925B | 31.05.2013 | B1 | PL374865 | 14.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL217223B | 30.06.2014 | B1 | PL397846 | 21.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL218992B | 27.02.2015 | B1 | PL401886 | 27.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1944322E | 01.07.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI354561B | 21.12.2011 | B | TW200412998 | 01.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI430810B | 21.03.2014 | B | TW201000131 | 01.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI527592B | 01.04.2016 | B | TW201302221 | 16.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US45577703 | 18.03.2003 | US41108102 | 16.09.2002 | US39727502 | 19.07.2002 | US41749002 | 10.10.2002 | Type | Divisional application | EP2336182 | EP2371859 | EP2298810 | EP2942359 | Type | Earlier application | EP1542720 |