Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | Lapse: 11.03.2015 | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HU | | IE | | IT | | LI | Lapse: 11.03.2015 | LU | | MC | | NL | | PT | | RO | | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 28.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | European patent granted | 11.03.2015 | Opposition procedure | 02.12.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent | published on 12.04.2017 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 16.07.2008 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 1542720 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 16.07.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 20.08.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | BANERJEE, SUBHASHIS | | Event date: | 20.08.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | TAYLOR, LORI K. | | Event date: | 20.08.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | SPIEGLER, CLIVE E. | | Event date: | 20.08.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | TRACEY, DANIEL, EDWARD | | Event date: | 20.08.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | CHARTASH, ELIOT, KEITH | | Event date: | 20.08.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HOFFMAN, REBECCA S. | | Event date: | 20.08.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | BARCHUK, WILLIAM T. | | Event date: | 20.08.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | YAN, PHILIP | | Event date: | 20.08.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MURTAZA, ANWAR | | Event date: | 20.08.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | SALFELD, JOCHEN, G. | | Event date: | 20.08.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | FISCHKOFF, STEVEN | | Event date: | 17.12.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 24.04.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK DE 1121463 HK | Code Expl.: | REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 29.07.2009 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20090617 | | Event date: | 26.08.2009 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 30.09.2009 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20090826 | | Event date: | 18.09.2013 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ABBVIE BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD | | Event date: | 03.12.2014 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20141110 | | Event date: | 10.12.2014 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED) | | Event date: | 17.12.2014 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20141121 | | Event date: | 11.03.2015 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 1542720 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 11.03.2015 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 11.03.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 13.03.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 15.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 715298 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20150415 | | Event date: | 16.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 60347406 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20150416 | | Event date: | 08.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 08.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2535365 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20150508 | | Event date: | 26.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 29.05.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | BOHEST AG, CH | | Event date: | 22.06.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20150615 | | Event date: | 01.07.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 15.07.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E010615 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20150609 | | Event date: | 01.07.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20150526 | | Event date: | 02.10.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 18847 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 24.06.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 30.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E024085 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 16.12.2015 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | AMGEN INC. | Effective DATE: | 20151106 | | Event date: | 18.12.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK GR 1121463 HK | Code Expl.: | +STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 06.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R026 60347406 DE | Code Expl.: | -OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT | | Event date: | 23.12.2015 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | KILBURN & STRODE LLP | Effective DATE: | 20151116 | | Event date: | 23.12.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB S72Z | Code Expl.: | CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977) | Free Format Text: | CLAIM LODGED; CLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED AT THE PATENTS COURT ON 29 OCTOBER 2015 (HP-2015-000053) | | Event date: | 13.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | SANOVEL IIAC SAN. VE TIC. A.S. | Effective DATE: | 20151209 | | Event date: | 13.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | POTTER CLARKSON LLP | Effective DATE: | 20151209 | | Event date: | 13.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | GENERICS (U.K.) LIMITED | Effective DATE: | 20151209 | | Event date: | 20.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD | Effective DATE: | 20151210 | | Event date: | 20.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | PHARMACEUTICAL WORKS POLPHARMA SA | Effective DATE: | 20151210 | | Event date: | 20.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | HOFFMANN EITLE | Effective DATE: | 20151211 | | Event date: | 20.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | BREUER, MARKUS | Effective DATE: | 20151210 | | Event date: | 20.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | PAJARO LIMITED | Effective DATE: | 20151211 | | Event date: | 20.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | APPELT, CHRISTIAN W. | Effective DATE: | 20151211 | | Event date: | 20.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | STADA-ARZNEIMITTEL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT | Effective DATE: | 20151210 | | Event date: | 20.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | SANOVEL IIAC SAN. VE TIC. A.S. | Effective DATE: | 20151209 | | Event date: | 20.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | PFIZER INC. | Effective DATE: | 20151211 | | Event date: | 10.02.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | PAJARO LIMITED | Effective DATE: | 20151211 | | Event date: | 11.12.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG RO EPE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA | | Event date: | 29.07.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20150401052 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20150618 | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB S72Z | Code Expl.: | CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977) | Free Format Text: | CLAIM LODGED; CLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED AT THE PATENTS COURT ON 12 APRIL 2016 (HP-2016-000016) | | Event date: | 21.06.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 29.07.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20160622 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 29.07.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20160624 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 29.07.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20160628 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 29.07.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20160627 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 29.07.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20160627 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.08.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20160627 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.08.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20160715 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.08.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20160628 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.08.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20160621 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.08.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20160629 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.08.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Payment DATE: | 20160628 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.09.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20160708 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 05.10.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | POTTER CLARKSON LLP | Effective DATE: | 20151209 | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20160725 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20160704 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20160706 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20160722 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.10.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20160801 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.11.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20160627 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.11.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20160708 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.11.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20160623 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.11.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20160714 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.12.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20160714 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.12.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20160708 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 15.02.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT UEP 715298 AT T | Code Expl.: | +PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION | Effective DATE: | 20150311 | | Event date: | 31.03.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PLX | Code Expl.: | -PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS | | Event date: | 12.04.2017 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED | Effective DATE: | 20161202 | | Event date: | 02.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R103 60347406 DE | Code Expl.: | -PATENT REVOKED BY EPO | | Event date: | 02.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R064 60347406 DE | Code Expl.: | -EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL | | Event date: | 12.04.2017 | | Event description: | GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE | Effective DATE: | 20161202 | | Event date: | 28.04.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES | Effective DATE: | 20150311 | | Event date: | 28.04.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES | Effective DATE: | 20150311 | | Event date: | 02.06.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK MC4A E 18847 SK | Code Expl.: | -ANNULMENT OF PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20161202 | | Event date: | 15.06.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE MF4A E010615 EE | Code Expl.: | -RIGHT REVOKED FOLLOWING OPPOSITION OR REVOCATION | Effective DATE: | 20170411 | | Event date: | 15.08.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MA03 715298 AT T | Code Expl.: | -REVOCATION OF THE PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20161202 | | Event date: | 03.10.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE ECNC | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT REVOKED | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20170705 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 30.04.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SI KO00 | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE OF PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20180321 | | Event date: | 30.11.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20180622 | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 13.02.2015 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 04.02.2015 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 21.11.2014 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 01.11.2014 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 01.11.2014 | | Event description: | INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1 | | Event date: | 31.10.2014 | | Event description: | OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA | | Event date: | 26.02.2014 | | Event description: | OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA | | Event date: | 16.08.2013 | | Event description: | OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA | | Event date: | 04.07.2013 | | Event description: | OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA | | Event date: | 26.09.2012 | | Event description: | OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA | | Event date: | 14.11.2008 | | Event description: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Event date: | 13.06.2008 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 15.04.2019 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED | | Event date: | 21.11.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Event date: | 10.03.2017 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009271 | | Event date: | 21.11.2016 | | Event description: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1 | | Event date: | 02.09.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 30.08.2016 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 24.06.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION MODIFIED RELATED TO COMMUNICATION OF A NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATIONS + TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCOBS2 | | Event date: | 20.04.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION MODIFIED RELATED TO COMMUNICATION OF A NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATIONS + TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCOBS2 | | Event date: | 18.01.2016 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 08.01.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 18.12.2015 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 18.12.2015 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 11.12.2015 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 20.11.2015 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 13.11.2015 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 10.03.2017 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED | |