EP1944322 - Treatment of TNF alpha related disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd Clarendon House 2, Church Street HM 11 Hamilton / BM | [2013/38] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Abbott Biotechnology Ltd. Clarendon House 2 Church Street Hamilton HM 11 / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banerjee, Subhashis 77 Dunbar Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | 02 /
Taylor, Lori K. 14576 West Crabapple Drive Wadsworth, IL 60083 / US | 03 /
Spiegler, Clive E. 70 Pepper Road Emmer Green Reading BERKS RG4 8TL / GB | 04 /
Tracey, Daniel, Edward 149 Shaker Road Harvard, MS 01451 / US | 05 /
Chartash, Eliot, Keith 28 Edinburgh Drive Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | 06 /
Hoffman, Rebecca S. 1300 Elmwood Avenue Wilmette, IL 60091 / US | 07 /
Barchuk, William T. 95 Madison Avenue, Apt. 1 Madison, NJ 07940 / US | 08 /
Yan, Philip 368 Old Creek Road Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | 09 /
Murtaza, Anwar 30 Treetop Park Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 10 /
Salfeld, Jochen, G. 177 Old Westboro Road North Grafton, MA 01536 / US | 11 /
Fischkoff, Steven 5 Canoe Brook Road Short Hills, NJ 07078 / US | [2008/34] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
Banerjee, Subhashis 77 Dunbar Lane Hamden, CT 06514 / US | ||
02 /
Taylor, Lori K. 14576 West Crabapple Drive Wadsworth, IL 60083 / US | |||
03 /
Spiegler, Clive E. 70 Pepper Road Emmer Green, Reading, BERKS RG4 8TL / GB | |||
04 /
Tracey, Daniel, Edward 149 Shaker Road Harvard, MS 01451 / US | |||
05 /
Chartash, Eliot, Keith 28 Edinburgh Drive Randolph, NJ 07869 / US | |||
06 /
Hoffman, Rebecca S. 1300 Elmwood Avenue Wilmette, IL 60091 / US | |||
07 /
Barchuk, William T. 95 Madison Avenue, Apt. 1 Madison, NJ 07940 / US | |||
08 /
Yan, Philip 368 Old Creek Road Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | |||
09 /
Murtaza, Anwar 30 Treetop Park Westborough, MA 01581 / US | |||
10 /
Salfeld, Jochen, G. 177 Old Westboro Road North Grafton, MA 01536 / US | |||
11 /
Fischkoff, Steven 5 Canoe Brook Road Short Hills, NJ 07078 / US | Representative(s) | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07150442.7 | 18.07.2003 | [2008/29] | Priority number, date | US20020397275P | 19.07.2002 Original published format: US 397275 P | US20020411081P | 16.09.2002 Original published format: US 411081 P | US20020417490P | 10.10.2002 Original published format: US 417490 P | US20030455777P | 18.03.2003 Original published format: US 455777 P | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1944322 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1944322 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1944322 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24, A61K39/395 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
C07K16/241 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP,KR);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP,KR);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP,KR);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP,KR);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K16/00 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2299/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/54 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | Behandlung von Erkrankungen im Zusammenhang mit TNF-alpha | [2008/29] | English: | Treatment of TNF alpha related disorders | [2008/29] | French: | Traitement des troubles associés au TND alpha | [2008/29] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2012 | Observations by third parties | 01.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2013 | Observations by third parties | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2013 | Observations by third parties | 18.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2014 | Observations by third parties | 28.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2014 | Observations by third parties | 21.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03748949.9 / EP1542720 | Divisional application(s) | EP10182274.0 / EP2336182 | EP10182730.1 / EP2371859 | EP10183702.9 / EP2298810 | EP15157149.4 / EP2942359 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030748949) is 30.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | 03
09.12.2015
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | 04
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Station Close Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 05
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | 06
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | 07
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pharmaceutical Works Polpharma SA Pelplinska 19 83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 08
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 09
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE Opponent's representative Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | 10
11.12.2015
16.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US Opponent's representative Royle, Matthew Charles James Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | 11
11.12.2015
23.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pajaro Limited 90 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1EQ / GB Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | 12
10.12.2015
17.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Breuer, Markus Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 23 80636 München / DE | 13
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE KILBURN & STRODE LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
03
09.12.2015
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
04
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Station Close Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
05
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
06
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
07
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pharmaceutical Works Polpharma SA Pelplinska 19 83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
08
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
09
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE Opponent's representative Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | |||
10
11.12.2015
16.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US Opponent's representative Royle, Matthew Charles James Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | |||
11
11.12.2015
23.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pajaro Limited 90 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1EQ / GB Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
12
10.12.2015
17.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Breuer, Markus Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 23 80636 München / DE | |||
13
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE KILBURN & STRODE LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
03
09.12.2015
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB Opponent's representative Bassett, Richard Simon Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
04
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Station Close Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
05
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
06
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
07
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pharmaceutical Works Polpharma SA Pelplinska 19 83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
08
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
09
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE Opponent's representative Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | |||
10
11.12.2015
16.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US Opponent's representative Royle, Matthew Charles James Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | |||
11
11.12.2015
23.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pajaro Limited 90 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1EQ / GB Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
12
10.12.2015
17.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Breuer, Markus Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 23 80636 München / DE | |||
13
11.12.2015
18.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE KILBURN & STRODE LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
03
09.12.2015
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB Opponent's representative Bassett, Richard Simon Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
04
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Station Close Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
05
09.12.2015
14.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
06
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
07
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pharmaceutical Works Polpharma SA Pelplinska 19 83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
08
10.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | |||
09
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE Opponent's representative Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | |||
10
11.12.2015
16.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US Opponent's representative Royle, Matthew Charles James Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | |||
11
11.12.2015
Pajaro Limited 90 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1EQ / GB Opponent's representative Kinkeldey, Daniela Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | |||
12
10.12.2015
17.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Breuer, Markus Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 23 80636 München / DE | |||
13
11.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE KILBURN & STRODE LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
03
09.12.2015
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB Opponent's representative Bassett, Richard Simon Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
04
09.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics (U.K.) Limited Station Close Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
05
09.12.2015
Sanovel IIaç San. ve Tic. A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilaç Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR | |||
Former [2015/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
16.11.2015
19.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE KILBURN & STRODE LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB Opponent's representative Lee, Nicholas John, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | |||
Former [2015/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2015
13.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 19.01.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.08.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.12.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.03.2015 | LI | 11.03.2015 | [2017/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9216553 (UNIV NEW YORK [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0614984 (MILES INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9729131 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 19; examples 1-4; claims 1,9,15,45,46,61,62,64-73 *; | [DY] - TAKEMATSU H ET AL, "Absence of tumor necrosis factor-alpha in suction blister fluids and stratum corneum from patients with psoriasis.", ARCHIVES OF DERMATOLOGICAL RESEARCH 1989, (1989), vol. 281, no. 6, ISSN 0340-3696, pages 398 - 400, XP002500126 [DY] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00455324 | [DY] - GROM A A ET AL, "Patterns of expression of tumor necrosis factor alpha, tumor necrosis factor beta, and their receptors in synovia of patients with juvenile rheumatoid arthritis and juvenile spondylarthropathy.", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM OCT 1996, (199610), vol. 39, no. 10, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 1703 - 1710, XP009107328 [DY] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.1780391013 | [A] - BODMER M ET AL, "Preclinial review of anti-tumor necrosis factor monoclonal antibodies", CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, WILLIAMS AND WILKINGS COMPANY, BALTIMORE, MA, US, (19931001), vol. 21, no. 10, ISSN 0090-3493, pages S441 - S446, XP009056980 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - BAUGH J A ET AL, "MECHANISMS FOR MODULATING TNFALPHA IN IMMUNE AND INFLAMMATORY DISEASE", CURRENT OPINION IN DRUG DISCOVERY AND DEVELOPMENT, CURRENT DRUGS, LONDON, GB, (20010101), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 1367-6733, pages 635 - 650, XP001145475 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | Examination | WO02100330 | - RUDOLF E SCHOPF ET AL, "Treatment of psoriasis with the chimeric monoclonal antibody against tumor necrosis factor alpha, infliximab", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY, C.V. MOSBY, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, vol. 46, no. 6, doi:10.1067/MJD.2002.120472, ISSN 0190-9622, (20020601), pages 886 - 891, (20020822), XP002643246 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/mjd.2002.120472 | - WOLLINA U ET AL, "Treatment of recalcitrant psoriatic arthritis with anti-tumor necrosis factor-alpha antibody", JEADV. JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY AND VENEREOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020301), vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 0926-9959, pages 127 - 129, XP002643247 | - ANONYMOUS, "REMICADE (infliximab)", (20020201), URL: http://www.drugbank.ca/system/fda_labels/DB00065.pdf?1265922797 | - NICKOLOFF B J ET AL, "Cellular localization of interleukin-8 and its inducer, tumor necrosis factor-alpha in psoriasis.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY JAN 1991 LNKD- PUBMED:1702929, (199101), vol. 138, no. 1, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 129 - 140 | - ETTEHADI P ET AL, "Elevated tumour necrosis factor-alpha (TNF-alpha) biological activity in psoriatic skin lesions.", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY APR 1994, (199404), vol. 96, no. 1, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 146 - 151 | - BRANDT ET AL., ""Experimentelle Therapie" bei entzündlichen Wirbelsäulenerkrankungen", MORBUS BECHTEREW JOURNAL, (20000601), vol. 81 | - KALDEN JOACHIM R, "Emerging role of anti-tumor necrosis factor therapy in rheumatic diseases.", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH 2002, (2002), vol. 4 Suppl 2, ISSN 1465-9913, pages S34 - S40 | - MEASE P J ET AL, "Etanercept in the treatment of psoriatic arthritis and psoriasis: a randomised trial.", LANCET 29 JUL 2000, (20000729), vol. 356, no. 9227, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 385 - 390 | - ANONYMOUS, "First therapy approved for treatment of psoriatic arthritis", (20020116), URL: http://www.psoriasis-netz.de/medikamente/etanercept/pm-enbrel.html | - GORMAN JENNIFER D ET AL, "Treatment of ankylosing spondylitis by inhibition of tumor necrosis factor alpha.", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE 2 MAY 2002, (20020502), vol. 346, no. 18, ISSN 1533-4406, pages 1349 - 1356 | - BATHON J M ET AL, "A comparison of etanercept and methotrexate in patients with early rheumatoid arthritis.", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE 30 NOV 2000, (20001130), vol. 343, no. 22, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1586 - 1593 | - CAUZA EDMUND ET AL, "Treatment of psoriatic arthritis and psoriasis vulgaris with the tumor necrosis factor inhibitor infliximab.", RHEUMATOLOGY INTERNATIONAL NOV 2002, (200211), vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 0172-8172, pages 227 - 232 | - "Studien zur Wirksamkeit bei Psoriasis und Psoriasis-Arthritis initiiert", (20030601), vol. 4, pages 100 - 102 | - VAN DE PUTTE ET AL., "One year efficacy results of the fully human anti-TNF antibody D2E7 in rheumatoid arthritis", BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, (20021001), vol. 43, Database accession no. 1218 | - ANONYMOUS, "HUMIRA", URL: http://www.fda.gov/downloads/Drugs/DevelopmentApprovalProcess/HowDrugsareDevelopedandApproved/ApprovalApplications/TherapeuticBiologicApplications/ucm092762.pdf | - D'HAENS G ET AL, "Etanercept in the treatment of active refractory Crohn's disease: a single-center pilot trial.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200109), Database accession no. NLM11569676 | - D'HAENS G ET AL, "Etanercept in the treatment of active refractory Crohn's disease: a single-center pilot trial.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY SEP 2001, (200109), vol. 96, no. 9, ISSN 0002-9270, pages 2564 - 2568 | - SANDBORN W J ET AL, "An engineered human antibody to TNF (CDP571) for active Crohn's disease: a randomized double-blind placebo-controlled trial.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200105), Database accession no. NLM11313302 | - SANDBORN W J ET AL, "An engineered human antibody to TNF (CDP571) for active Crohn's disease: a randomized double-blind placebo-controlled trial.", GASTROENTEROLOGY MAY 2001, (200105), vol. 120, no. 6, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 1330 - 1338 | by applicant | US4399216 | US4510245 | EP0154316 | US4634665 | US4816397 | US4968615 | EP0401384 | WO9103553 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9209690 | WO9215679 | WO9218619 | WO9220791 | US5168062 | US5179017 | WO9301288 | US5223409 | US5231024 | EP0260610 | WO9319751 | WO9406476 | US5656272 | US6090382 | US6258562 | WO02072636 | US6509015 | US2003092059 | US2003219438 | - MOELLER ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1990), vol. 2, page 162 | - VASILLI, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 10, page 411 | - TRACEY; CERAMI, ANNU. REV. MED., (1994), vol. 45, page 491 | - PENNICA, D. ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 724 - 729 | - DAVIS, J.M. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1987), vol. 26, pages 1322 - 1326 | - JONES, E.Y. ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 338, pages 225 - 228 | - WARD, NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUSTON, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - HOLLIGER, P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - POLJALC, R.J. ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123 | - SONGSIVILAI; LACHMANN, CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 79, pages 315 - 321 | - KOSTELNY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - TAYLOR, L.D., NIICL, ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, page 6287 | - JÖNSSON ET AL., ANN!. BIOL. CLIN., (1993), vol. 51, page 19 | - JONSSON, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1991), vol. 11, pages 620 - 627 | - JOLMSSOLL ET AL., J. MOL. RECOGNIT., (1995), vol. 8, page 125 | - JOHNSON ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1991), vol. 198, page 268 | - FOCUS AN GROWTH FACTORS, (1992), vol. 3, pages 4 - 10 | - CANFIELD, S.M.; S.L. MORRISON, J. EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 173, pages 1483 - 1491 | - LUND, J. ET AL., J. OF IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 2657 - 2662 | - TOMLINSON, I.M. ET AL., "The Repertoire of Human Germline V Sequences Reveals about Fifty Groups of V Segments with Different Hypervariable Loops", J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 776 - 798 | - COX, J.P.L. ET AL., "A Directory of Human Germ-line V Segments Reveals a Strong Bias in their Usage", EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 827 - 836 | - KABAT, E.A. ET AL., Sequences of Proteins of Imnumological Interest, NIH PUBLICATION, (1991), pages 91 - 3242 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - GOEDDEL, Gene Expression Teclztzology: lvlethods i Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185 | - BOSS, M.A.; WOOD, C. R., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1985), vol. 6, pages 13 - 13 | - URLAUB; CHASIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | - R.J. KAUFMAN; P.A. SHARP, MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 159, pages 601 - 621 | - PHAMIACIA RECOMBINANT PHAGE ANTIBODY SYSTEM, no. 27 | - FUCHS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 1370 - 1372 | - HAY ET AL., HUM ANTIBOD HYBRIDOMAS, (1992), vol. 3, pages 81 - 85 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281 | - GRIFFITHS ET AL., EMBO J, (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - HAWKINS ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (1992), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - GRAM ET AL., PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 3576 - 3580 | - GARRARD ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 1373 - 1377 | - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., NUC ACID RES, (1991), vol. 19, pages 4133 - 4137 | - BARBAS ET AL., PNAS, (1991), vol. 88, pages 7978 - 7982 | - MOELLER, A. ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1990), vol. 2, pages 162 - 169 | - VASILLI, P., ANNU, REV, IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 10, pages 411 - 452 | - TRACEY, K.J.; CERAMI, A., ANNU. REV. MED., (1994), vol. 45, pages 491 - 503 | - SHIMIZU ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 6441 | - NICKOLOFF, INVESTIG DERMATOL SYMP PROC, (2000), vol. 5, page 67 | - AUSTIN ET AL., AM J PATHOL., (1995), vol. 146, page 1529 | - LERNER ET AL., J INVEST DERMATOL., (1986), vol. 87, page 299 | - BAEDER ET AL., CLIN EXP IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 89, page 174 | - HASEYAMA ET AL., TOHOKU JEXP MED., (2002), vol. 198, page 233 | - MALOINO ET AL., EXP.ANIM., (1980), vol. 29, page 1 | - KOLB, DIABETES/METABOLISM REVIEWS, (1987), vol. 3, page 751 | - HAMADA ET AL., METABOLISM., (2001), vol. 50, page 1282 | - COLEMAN, DIABETOLOGIA, (1978), vol. 14, page 141 | - BAILEY ET AL., INT.J.OBESITY, (1982), vol. 6, page 1.1 | - NOSE, M. ET AL., AM. J. PATH., (1996), vol. 149, page 1763 | - KINJOH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1993), vol. 90, page 3413 | - BROUWER, E. ET AL., J. EXP. MIED., (1993), vol. 177, page 905 | - HESSEL, EM. ET AL., EUR J PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 293, page 401 | - KEAST D ET AL., J. PATHOL., (1981), vol. 135, page 249 | - FERNS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 253, page 1129 | - CLOWES, LAB. INVEST., vol. 49, page 208 | - LINDNER ET AL., CIRC RES., (1993), vol. 73, page 792 | - COCCIA ET AL., EXP HEMATOLOGY., (2001), vol. 29, pages 1201 - 1209 | - BENNETT; ZIE, PAIN., (1988), vol. 33, pages 87 - 107 | - KIM; CHUNG, PAIN, (1992), vol. 50, pages 355 - 363 | - MOELLER, A. ET AL., CYTOL NE, (1990), vol. 2, pages 162 - 169 | - VERJANS ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1991), vol. 34, no. 4, page 486 | - VERJANS ET AL., CLIN EXP IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 97, no. 1, page 45 | - KAIJTZEL ET AL., HUM IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 60, no. 2, page 140 | - PARTSCH, ANN RHEUM DIS., (1998), vol. 57, page 691 | - RITCHLIN ET AL., J RHEUMATOL., (1998), vol. 25, page 1544 | - BRAUN ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1999), vol. 42, no. 10, page 2039 | - ZEIDLER ET AL., RHEUM DIS CLIN NORTH AM., (1992), vol. 18, page 187 | - PIQUET PF ET AL., J EXP MED., (1989), vol. 170, pages 655 - 63 | - WHYTE M ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED., (2000), vol. 162, pages 755 - 8 | - ANTICEVICH SZ ET AL., EUR J PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 284, pages 221 - 5 | - WHYTE M ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2000), vol. 162, pages 755 - 8 | - CORBETT EL ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED., (2002), vol. 165, pages 690 - 3 | - PIQUET ET AL., AM J PATHOL, (1993), vol. 143, page 651 | - NASH ET AL., HISTOPATHOLOGY, (1993), vol. 22, page 343 | - ZHANG ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 150, page 4188 | - WHYTE ET AL., SUPRA | - CORBETT EL ET AL., SUPRA | - "Am. J. Respir. Crit. Care Med.", AMERICAN THORACIC SOCIETY, (2000), vol. 161, page 646 | - THOMAS PS ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED., (1995), vol. 152, pages 76 - 80 | - THOMAS PS; HEYWOOD G., THORAX., (2002), vol. 57, pages 774 - 8 | - ORDONEZ CL. ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2000), vol. 161, page 1185 | - KIPS ET AL., AM REV RESPIR DIS, (1992), vol. 145, page 332 | - "NAEPP Expert Panel Report Guidelines for the Diagnosis and Management of Asthma-Update on Selected Topics", JACI, (2002), vol. 110, pages S141 - S209 | - Guidelines for the Diagnosis and Management of Asthma, NIH PUBLICATION, (199707), vol. 97, page 4051 | - KEATINGS VM., CHEST., (2000), vol. 118, pages 971 - 5 | - SAKAO S ET AL., AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED., (2001), vol. 163, pages 420 - 22 | - SAKAO S ET AL., CHEST., (2002), vol. 122, pages 416 - 20 | - MEDALL ET AL., HEART, (1997), vol. 78, no. 3, page 273 | - FERMS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 253, page 1129 | - CLOWES ET AL., LAB. INVEST., (1983), vol. 49, page 208 | - ZHOU ET AL., ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (2002), vol. 161, page 153 | - JAVED ET AL., EXP AND MOL PATHOL, (2002), vol. 73, page 104 | - ZIMMENNAN ET AL., AM J PHSIOL REGUL INTEGR CAMP PHYSIOL, (2002), vol. 283, page 505 | - COLBUM; MOORE, "Myointimal Hyperplasia", VASCULAR SURGERY: A COMPREHENSIVE REVIEW, (1998), pages 690 - 709 | - BERK; HARRIS, ADV. INTETN. MED., (1995), vol. 40, pages 455 - 501 | - CLAGETT ET AL., J. VASC. SURG., (1986), vol. 3, pages 10 - 23 | - LEVINE ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (1990), vol. 323, page 236 | - TORRE-AMIONE ET AL., J AM COLL CARDIOL, (1996), vol. 27, page 1201 | - CHUNG ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2003), vol. 107, page 3133 | - LIBBY, CIRCULATION, (1995), vol. 91, page 2844 | - NAKAMURA ET AL., J. CARDIOL., (2003), pages 41 - 41 | - SUGANO ET AL., FASEB J, (2002), vol. 16, page 1421 | - BALBAY ET AL., ANGIOLOGY, (2001), page 52109 | - SPIEGEHNAN; HOTAMISLIGIL, CELL, (1993), vol. 73, page 625 | - CHU ET AL., IT JOBES RELAT METAB DISORD., (2000), vol. 24, page 1085 | - ISHII ET AL., METABOLISM., (2000), vol. 49, page 1616 | - NAVARRO J.F.; MORA C.; MACA, AM J KIDNEY DIS., (200307), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 53 - 61 | - DAIMON M ET AL., DIABETES CARE, (200307), vol. 26, no. 7, pages 2015 - 20 | - ZHANG M ET AL., J TONGJI MED UNIV., (1999), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 203 - 5 | - BARBIERI M ET AL., AM J HYPERTENS, (200307), vol. 16, no. 7, pages 537 - 43 | - MCCALL, J. ET AL., BR. J. SURG., (1992), vol. 79, pages 1361 - 3 | - BENJAFIELD ET AL., DIABETES CARE, (2001), vol. 24, page 753 | - QIANG, X. ET AL., DIABETALOGIA, (1998), vol. 41, pages 132 - 6 | - PFEIFFER ET AL., HORM METAB RES., (1997), vol. 29, page 111 | - SCHOLZ ET AL., TRENDS MICROBIOL., (2003), vol. 11, page 171 | - LEE ET AL., HUM IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 64, page 614 | - NAVARRO ET AL., AM J KIDNEY DIS., (2003), vol. 42, page 53 | - DAIMON ET AL., DIABETES CARE., (2003), vol. 26, page 2015 | - ZHANG ET AL., J TONGJI MED UNIV., (1999), vol. 19, page 203 | - BARBIERI ET AL., AM J HYPERTENS, (2003), vol. 16, page 537 | - VENN ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1993), vol. 36, page 819 | - WESTACOTT ET AL., J RHEUMATOL., (1994), vol. 21, page 1710 | - DEVARAJ ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2000), vol. 102, page 191 | - HATTORI Y ET AL., CARDIOVASC RES., (2000), vol. 46, page 188 | - CLAUSELL N ET AL., CARDIOVASC PATHOL., (1999), vol. 8, page 145 | - PIHLAJAMAKI J ET AL., OBES RES., (2003), vol. 11, page 912 | - BARBIERI ET AL., M J HYPERTENS., (2003), vol. 16, page 537 | - TSUDA ET AL., J NUTR., (2003), vol. 133, page 2125 | - JONGEN-LAVRENCIC M. ET AL., J. RHEUMATOL., (1997), vol. 24, no. 8, pages 1504 - 9 | - DEMETER J. ET AL., ANN HEMATOL., (2002), vol. 81, no. 10, pages 566 - 9 | - DICATO M., THE ONCOLOGIST, (2003), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 19 - 21 | - SORKIN, LS. ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE., (1997), vol. 81, no. 1, pages 255 - 62 | - HUYGEN FJ. ET AL., MEDIATORS INFLAMM., (2002), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 47 - 51 | - PARADA CA. ET AL., EUR J NEUROSCI., (2003), vol. 17, no. 9, pages 1847 - 52 | - SAMMER C., SCHMERZ., (1999), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 315 - 23 | - EMPL M ET AL., NEUROLOGY., (2001), vol. 56, no. 10, pages 1371 - 7 | - SCHAFERS M ET AL., J NEUROSCI., (2003), vol. 23, no. 7, pages 3028 - 38 | - MYERS, REGIONAL ANESTHESIA, (1995), vol. 20, pages 173 - 184 | - COELHO A. ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL GASTROINTEST LIVER PHYSIOL., (2000), vol. 279, pages G781 - G790 | - COELHO A ET AL., BRAIN RES BULL., (2000), vol. 52, no. 3, pages 223 - 8 | - COLLETTI LM. ET AL., J CLIN INVEST., (1990), vol. 85, no. 6, pages 1936 - 43 | - TIEGS G., ACTA GASTROENTEROL BELG., (1997), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 176 - 9 | - FERNANDEZ ED. ET AL., J ENDOTOXIN RES., (2000), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 321 - 8 | - GONZALEZ-AMARO, J EXP MED., (1994), vol. 179, pages 841 - 8 | - NELSON DR ET AL., DIG DIS SCI, (1997), vol. 42, pages 2487 - 94 | - KALLINOWSKI B ET AL., CLIN EXP IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 111, pages 269 - 77 | - COOKSON S. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1999), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 851 - 6 | - JAZRAWI S. ET AL., LIVER TRANSPL., (2003), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 377 - 82 | - JOHNSON P. J. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1993), vol. 18, pages 998 - 1005 | - HOMBERG J. C. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1987), vol. 7, pages 1333 - 1339 | - MAGGIORE G., J. PE IATR. GASTROENTEROL NUTR., (1993), vol. 17, pages 376 - 381 | - MARTINI E. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1988), vol. 8, pages 1662 - 1666 | - VALENTI L. ET AL., GAST OENEROLOGY, (2002), vol. 122, no. 2, pages 274 - 80 | - LI Z. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2003), vol. 37, no. 2, pages 343 - 50 | - KASAHARA S. ET AL., J VIRAL., (2003), vol. 77, no. 4, pages 2469 - 76 | - WANG F.S., WORLD J GASTROENTEROL., (2003), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 641 - 4 | - BIENNER M. ET AL., J VIROL., (2003), vol. 77, no. 7, pages 4033 - 42 | - BRUCCOLERI A ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1997), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 133 - 41 | - LUSTER M.I. ET AL., ANN NY ACAD SCI., (2000), vol. 919, pages 214 - 20 | - SIMEONOVA P. ET AL., TOXICOL APPL PHARMACOL., (2001), vol. 177, no. 2, pages 112 - 20 | - TAKENAKA K. ET AL., DIG DIS SCI., (1998), vol. 43, no. 4, pages 887 - 92 | - NAGALD M. ET AL., J HEPATOL., (1999), vol. 31, no. 6, pages 997 - 1005 | - STREETZ K. ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2000), vol. 119, no. 2, pages 446 - 60 | - CRESPO J. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY., (2001), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 1158 - 63 | - LUDWIG, J. R. ET AL., MAYO CLI Z. PROC., (1980), vol. 55, page 434 | - POWELL E. ET AL., HEPATOL., (1990), vol. 11, page 74 | - TAKEMATSU ET AL., ARCH DERMATOL RES., (1989), vol. 283, page 398 | - VICTOR; GOTTLIEB, J DRUGS DERMATOL., (2002), vol. 1, no. 3, page 264 | - ASADULLAH ET AL., BR J DERMATOL., (1999), vol. 141, page 94 | - SKLAVOUNOU ET AL., J ORAL PATHOL MED., (2000), vol. 29, page 370 | - REUSS-BORST, BR J HAEMATOL., (1993), vol. 84, page 356 | - TUTUNEU Z ET AL., CLIN EXP RHEUMATOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 146 - 51 | - MACKIEWICZ Z ET AL., CLIN EXP RHEUMATOL., (2003), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 41 - 8 | - MUROTA H ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2003), vol. 48, no. 4, pages 1117 - 25 | - DEGUCHI ET AL., LANCET., (1989), vol. 2, page 745 | - SNELLER, M.C., CLEVE. CLIN. J. MED., (2002), vol. 69, pages II40 - 3 | - SCHETT, G. ET AL., ANN. RHEUM. DI ., (2002), vol. 61, page 463 | - STRAUB, R.H. ET AL., RHEUMATOLOGY, (2002), vol. 41, page 423 | - UDDHAMMAR, A. ET AL., BR. J. RHEUMATOL., (1998), vol. 37, page 766 | - KOBAYASHI, Y; NUMANO, F., INTERN. MED., (2002), vol. 41, page 44 | - FRAGA, A.; MEDINA F., CURR. RHEUMASTOL. REP., (2002), page 4 | - DIGIROLAMO, N,, J. LEUKOC, BIOL., (1997), vol. 61, page 667 | - SUNDEL, R.P., CURR. RHEUMATOL.REP., (2002), vol. 4, page 474 | - GEDALIA, A., CURR. RHEUMATOL. REP., (2002), vol. 4, page 25 | - SFIKAKIS, P.P., ANN. RHEUM. DIS., (2002), vol. 61, pages 51 - 3 | - DOGAN, D.; FARAH, C., OFTALMOLOGIA., (2002), vol. 52, page 23 | - Inflammatory Disease of Blood Vessels, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (2001), page 473 | - MARQUEZ, J. ET AL., CURR. RHEUMATOL. REP., (2003), vol. 5, page 128 | - HARMAN, L.E.; MARGO, C.E., SURV. OPHTHALMOL., (1998), vol. 42, page 458 | - GROSS, W.L, CURR. OPIN. RHEUMATOL., (2002), vol. 14, page 11 | - CHURG, W.A., MOD. PATHOL., (2001), vol. 14, page 1284 | - TRACY, K.J. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 234, pages 470 - 474 | - SUN, X-M. ET AL., J. CLIN, INVEST., (1988), vol. 81, pages 1328 - 1331 | - MACDONALD, T.T. ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 81, pages 301 - 305 | - GROM ET AL., ARHIRITIS RHEUM., (1996), vol. 39, page 1703 | - MANGGE ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1995), vol. 8, page 211 | - EISENNANN J ET AL., FERTIL STERIL, (1988), vol. 50, page 573 | - HALME J., AM J OBSTET GYNECOL, (1989), vol. 161, page 1718 | - MORI H ET AL., AM J REPROD IMMUNOL, (1991), vol. 26, page 62 | - TAKETANI Y ET AL., AM J OBSTET GYNECOL, (1992), vol. 167, page 265 | - OVERTON C ET AL., HUM REPROD, (1996), vol. 11, page 380 | - ALEXANDER RB ET AL., UROLOGY, (1998), vol. 52, page 744 | - NADLER RB ET AL., J UROL, (2000), vol. 164, page 214 | - ORHAN ET AL., INT J UROL, (2001), vol. 8, page 495 | - ASAKAWA K ET AL., HINYOKIKA KIYO, (2001), vol. 47, page 459 | - HARRIS ET AL., PROSTATE, (2000), vol. 44, page 25 | - SHVIDEL ET AL., HEMATOL ., (2002), vol. 3, page 32 | - STUDNICKA-BENKE ET AL., BR J RHEUMATOL., (1996), vol. 35, page 1067 | - OH H ET AL., INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (1999), vol. 40, page 1891 | - OZAKTAY ET AL., EUR SPINE J., (2002), vol. 11, page 467 | - BRISBY ET AL., EUR SPINE J., (2002), vol. 11, page 62 | - KOSKI ET AL., CLIN EXP RHEUMATOL., (2001), vol. 19, page 131 | - WAKEFIELD; LLOYD, CYTOKINE, (1992), vol. 4, page 1 | - WOON ET AL., CURR EYE RES, (1998), vol. 17, page 955 | - TSUTSUMIMOTO ET AL., J BONE MINER RES., (1999), vol. 14, page 1751 | - VENN ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEURIT., (1993), vol. 36, page 819 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1994), vol. 37, page 295 | - J INVEST. MED., (1996), vol. 44, page 235 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1995), vol. 38, page 185 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1993), vol. 36, page 1223 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 9, page 284 | - AMER-. J. PHYSIOL. - HEAT AND CIRCULATORY PHYSIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 268, pages 37 - 42 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 9, page 282 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 9, page 81 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 9, page 82 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 9, page 131 | - INFLAMMATION RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 45, pages 103 - 107 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 9, page 280 | - NEURO REPORT, (1996), vol. 7, pages 1209 - 1213 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 9, page 281 | - ARTHRITIS. & RHEUMATISM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 9, page 296 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 9, page 308 | - ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1996), vol. 39, no. 9, page 120 | - DELUCA ET AL., RHEUM. DIS. CLIN. NORTH AM., (1995), vol. 21, pages 759 - 777 | - ZHANG ET AL., CURR RHEUMATOL REP., (2002), vol. 4, page 507 | - MARZI ET AL., SHOCK, (1995), vol. 3, page 27 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI US A., (1992), vol. 99, page 9784 | - MOLL ET AL., AIM RHEUM DIS, (1973), vol. 32, page 354 | - VAN DER LINDEN ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1984), vol. 27, page 361 | - GARRETT ET AL., J RHEUMATOL, (1994), vol. 21, page 2286 | - JENKINSON ET AL., J RHEUMATOL, (1994), vol. 21, page 1694 | - CALIN ET AL., J RHEUMATOL, (1994), vol. 21, page 2281 | - HESSEL, E.M. ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACAL., (1995), vol. 293, page 401 | - DAPHNE, T. ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CELL MOL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 25, page 751 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1992), vol. 89, page 9784 | - HOFSTRA, C.L. ET AL., INFLAMM. RES., (1999), vol. 48, page 602 | - KEAST, D. ET AL., J. PATHOL., (1981), vol. 135, page 249 | - HAUTMAKI, R.D. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, page 2002 | - HAUTMAKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, page 2002 | - COLIN, L. ET AL., J. EXP. MED, (1997), vol. 186, page 1737 | - RAY, P. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1997), vol. 100, page 2501 | - BOWDEN, D.H., LAB. INVEST., (1984), vol. 50, page 487 | - TOKUDA, A. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, page 2745 | - SMITH ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 153, page 4704 | - YONEYAMA ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1998), vol. 102, page 1933 | - MURAI ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1999), vol. 104, page 49 | - JONES, P.W. ET AL., RESP. MED., (1991), vol. 85, no. 25 | - Textbook of Respiratory Medicine, (2000), pages 541 - 552 | - KUMAR; LINDNER, ARTERIOSCLER. THROMB. VASE. BIOL., (1997), vol. 17, page 2238 | - WAARD ET AL., ARTERIOSCLER. THROMB. VASC. BIOL., (2002), vol. 22, page 1978 | - MARZI ET AL., SRIOCRC, (1995), vol. 3, page 27 | - WAARD ET AL., SUPRA | - KUMAR; LINDNER, SUPRA | - KUMAR ET AL., CIRCULATION, (1997), vol. 96, page 4333 | - LENTZ SR ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2002), vol. 106, no. 7, pages 842 - 6 | - JACKSON ET AL., AM HEART J, (2003), vol. 145, page 875 | - BURNS ET AL., J AM COLL CARDIAL., (2002), vol. 39, page 30 | - UEDA ET AL., DIABETES, (199905), vol. 48, pages 1168 - 1174 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U SA., (1992), vol. 89, page 9784 | - COLEMAN, SUPRA | - WESTMAN, DIABETOLOGIA, (1968), vol. 4, page 141 | - BRAY; YORK, PHYSIOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (1971), vol. 51, page 598 | - MARZI ET AL., SLAOCLC, (1995), vol. 3, page 27 | - CATANI ET AL., BRAZ. J. MED. BIOL. RES, (2003), vol. 36, page 693 | - COCCIA ET AL., EXP. HEMATOLOGY, (2001), vol. 29, page 1201 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI US ., (1992), vol. 89, page 9784 | - MARZI ET AL., SHOCK, (1995), vol. 3, page 7 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S, (1992), vol. 89, page 9784 | - SHIMIZU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 6441 | - WEINER ET AL., LANCET, (1990), vol. 335, page 1 | - SHIMIZU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 2138 | - NICKOLOFF ET AL., AM J PATLLAL, (1995), vol. 146, pages 580 - 8 | - FREDRIKSSON; PETTERSSON, DERMATOLOGICA, (1978), vol. 157, pages 238 - 44 | - HIRATA, Y. ET AL., ACTA. OTOLARYNGOL., (1993), vol. 503, page 79 | - EMBO J, (1991), vol. 10, pages 4025 - 4031 | - WI LIAMS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1992), vol. 89, page 9784 | - LEHMAN, T.J. ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1985), vol. 28, page 652 | - DUONG, T.T., INT IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 15, page 79 | - BRAHN, E. ET AL., CLIN IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 90, page 147 | - LEHMAN ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1985), vol. 28, page 652 | - DUONG, INT IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 15, page 79 | - BRAHN ET AL., CLIN IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 90, page 147 | - GRUNEBAUM ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 130, page 233 | - BLANK ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 102, page 120 | - TOMER ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1995), vol. 38, page 1375 | - DAMIANOVICH ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 156, page 4946 | - GRUNEBAUM ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMNOL., (2002), vol. 130, page 233 | - TOMERETAL, ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1995), vol. 38, page 1375 | - BARRON, IT.S ET AL., J. RHEUMATOL., (1999), vol. 26, page 170 | - LANCET, (1990), vol. 335, page 1078 | - KAKLAMANI, V.G. ET AL., SEMIN. ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2001), vol. 30, page 299 | - REILLY; GILLCESON, IMMUNOLOGIC RESEARCH., (2002), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 143 - 153 | - MISHRA ET AL., J CLIN LI VEST., (2003), vol. 111, no. 4, pages 539 - 552 | - WEINBERG ET AL., J EXP MED., (1994), vol. 179, page 651 | - WATSON ET AL., J EXP ALED., (1992), vol. 176, pages 1645 - 1656 | - VITALI, ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1993), vol. 36, pages 340 - 7 | - FOX, ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1986), vol. 29, pages 577 - 85 | - NAVAZESH, ANN NY ACAD SCI, (1993), vol. 694, pages 72 - 7 | - GIAMIINI ET AL., ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1997), vol. 40, page 1202 | other | WO02100330 | - "Industrial Forum - Industrieforum", DERMATOLOGY AND PSYCHOSOMATICS, (2003), vol. 4, pages 100 - 102, XP003031408 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000072204 | - Humira (adalimumab Rx Only tear at Perforation to Dispense Patient Information., XP003031409 | - VAN DE PUTTE ET AL, "ONE YEAR EFFICACY RESULTS OF THE FULLY HUMAN ANTI-TNF ANTIBODY D2E7 IN RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS.", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (20001031), vol. 43, no. SUPPL, page S269, XP003031410 | - ETTEHADI P. ET AL, "ELEVATED TUMOUR NECROSIS FACTOR-ALPHA (TNF-ALPHA) BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY IN PSORIATIC SKIN LESIONS", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 96, no. 1, pages 146 - 151, XP000990589 | - KEYSTONE E. ET AL, "The fully human anti-tnf monoclonal antibody,adalimumab (D2E7), dose ranging study: The 24-week clinical results in patients with active ra on methotrexate therapy (the armada trail)", EULAR ABSTRACTS, (20010615), page 1, XP003032184 | - KAVANAUGH A.F. ET AL, "The armada trail: 12-month efficacy and safety of combination therapy with adalmumab (D2E7), the first........with active rheumatoid arthritis.", RHEAMATOID ARTHRITIS TREATMENT 2 EULAR ABSTRACT, (20020612), page 1, XP003032185 | - SCHIFF M. ET AL, "A randomized, controllede, safety trail of adablimumab (D2E7).....(safety trail of adalimumab in rheumatoid arthritis) trail.", RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS TREATMENT EULAR ABSTRACTS, (20020612), page 1, XP003032186 | - BRANDT J. ET AL, "Experimentelle Therapie, bei entzündlichen Wirbelsäulenerkrankungen.", MORBUS-BECHTEREW-JOURNAL, (200006), pages 1 - 7, XP003032187 | - KALDEN J.R., "Emerging role of anti-tumor necrosis factor therapy in rheumatic diseases.", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH, (20020524), vol. 4, no. SUPL2, pages S34 - S40, XP003032188 | - MEASE P.J. ET AL, "Etanercept in the treatment of psoriatic arthritis and psoriasis: A randomised trial", LANCET, (20000729), vol. 356, no. 9227, pages 385 - 390, XP002152293 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(00)02530-7 | - GORMAN J.D. ET AL, "Treatment of Ankylosing Spondylitis by Inhibition of Tumor Necrosis Factor alpha", N ENGL J MED, (20020502), vol. 346, no. 18, pages 1349 - 1356, XP055078271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa012664 | - BATHON J.M. ET AL, "A Comparison of Etanercept and Methotrexate in Patients with Early Rheumatoid Arthritis", N ENGL J MED, (20001130), vol. 343, no. 22, pages 156 - 1593, XP055078275 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM200011303432201 | - MARZO-ORTEGA H. ET AL, "Infliximab is effective in the treatment of resistant psoriatic arthritis and skin psoriasis: a clinical and mri study", RHEUMATOLOGY, (200204), vol. 41, no. SUPPL. 2 ABSTRACT OP11, page 5, XP003032189 | - CAUZA E. ET AL, "Treatment of psoriatic arthritis and psoriasis vulgaris with the tumor necrosis factor inhibitor infliximab", RHEUMATOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, (20021101), vol. 22, pages 227 - 232, XP055078282 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00296-002-0246-3 | - D'HAENS G. ET AL, "Etanercept in the Treatment of Active Refractory Crohn's Disease: A Single-Center Pilot Trail", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, (20010901), vol. 96, no. 9, pages 2564 - 2568, XP055104127 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9270(01)03267-1 | - SANDBORN W.J. ET AL, "An engineered human antibody to TNF (CDP571) for active Crohn's disease: A randomized double-blind placebo-controlled trial", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2001), vol. 120, no. 6, pages 1330 - 1338, XP055104132 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/gast.2001.24042 | Opposition | WO02100330 | WO2004009776 | EP1944322 | - "Annual Update 2003 Dermatologic Drugs", Drugs of the Future, (20030000), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 175 - 209, XP055264156 | - LORENZ H. M. et al., "Perspectives for TNF-a-targeting therapies", Arthritis Res, (20020000), vol. 4, no. suppl. 3, pages S17 - S 24, XP002369193 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar564 | - LEXISNEXIS, Abott Laboratories Initiates Clinical Trials to Explore Use of HUMRA ? (adalimumab) in Psoriasis and Psoriatic Athritis: - Enrollment Under way in Both Trials-''., (20030303), pages 25 - 28 | - CHAUDHARI U. et al., "Efficacy and safety of infliximab monotherapy for plug-type psoriasis: A randomized trial", Lancet, (20010000), vol. 359, no. 9271, pages 1842 - 1847, XP004244976 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(00)04954-0 | - Remicade® (infliximab) product information, (20020201), URL: http://www.drugbank.ca/system/fda_labels/DB00065.pdf?1265922797 | - WOLLINA U. et al., "Treatment of recalcitrant psoriatic arthritis with anti-tumor necrosis factor-alpha antibody", JEADV, (20020000), vol. 16, pages 127 - 129, XP002643247 | - CAUZA E. et al., "Treatment of psoriatic arthritis and psoriasis vulgaris with the tumor necrosis factor inhibitor infliximab'';", Rheumatol Int, (20020000), vol. 22, pages 227 - 232, XP055078282 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00296-002-0246-3 | - "Summary of Product Characteristics of HUMIRA", FDA | - JÜRGEN BRAUN et al., "Novel approaches in the treatment of ankylosing spondylits and other spondyloarthritides", Expert Opinion on Investigational Drugs, (20030000), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 1097 - 1109, XP003000090 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.12.7.1097 | - MEASE P. J., "Tumour necrosis factor (TNF) in psoriatic arthritis: pathophysiology and treatment with TNF inhibitors''.", Ann. Rheum. Dis., (20020000), vol. 61, no. 4, pages 298 - 304, XP008133605 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/ard.61.4.298 | - MEASE PJ;, Ann Rheum Dis, (20020000), vol. 61, pages 298 - 304, XP008133605 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/ard.61.4.298 | - BRAUN et al., Biodrugs, (20030000), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 187 - 199, XP008082603 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00063030-200317030-00005 | - Advisory Committee Briefing Document - Adalimumab | - WEINBLATT et al., ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM;, (20030100), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 35 - 45, XP002658859 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.10697 | - RAU R;, Ann Rheum Dis, (20020000), vol. 61, pages ii70 - ii73 | - COSTELLO et al., Wisconsin Medical Journal, (20030000), vol. 102;, no. 7, pages 29 - 33, XP055264174 | - MEASE PJ et al., THE LANCET;, (20000729), vol. 356, pages 385 - 390, XP002152293 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(00)02530-7 | - CAUZA E. et al., Rheumatol Int, (20020000), vol. 22, pages 227 - 232, XP055078282 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00296-002-0246-3 | - CHAUDHARI U et al., THE LANCET;, (20010609), vol. 357, pages 1842 - 1847, XP004244976 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(00)04954-0 | - Dermatol Psychosom, (20030000), vol. 4;, pages 100 - 102 | - MARZO-ORTEGA et al., Rheumatology, (20020000), XP003032189 |