EP1821539 - Decoding apparatus and integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, T. Matsushita Electric Ind. Co, Ltd. IP Dev.Ctr. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
Kitamura, A., Matsushita Electric Ind. Co, Ltd. IP Dev.Ctr. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250600.9 | 14.02.2007 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | JP20060038470 | 15.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006038470 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1821539 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1821539 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167, G06F9/445 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04N21/4432 (EP,US);
H04N21/4623 (EP,US);
H04N21/818 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/34] | H04N7/167 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dekodierungsvorrichtung und integrierte Schaltungsanordnung | [2007/34] | English: | Decoding apparatus and integrated circuit | [2007/34] | French: | Appareil de décodage et circuit intégré | [2007/34] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005251689 (LEE WEN-CHIEH [TW], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] *; | [A]WO2004012060 (O2MICRO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * pages 32-35 *; | [A]US2005168638 (IWATA TAKESHI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0019] *; | [A]US6763458 (WATANABE RYOJI [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * columns 5-6 *; | [A]US2005160474 (OBITSU TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2005011336 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |