EP1830607 - Lighting and systems for controlling lighting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Actia (UK) Limited Unit 81 Mochdre Enterprise Park Newtown Powys SY16 4LE / GB | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terry, Richard Peter ACTIA (UK) Ltd., Unit 81 Mochdre Enterprise Park Newtown, Powys SY16 4LE / GB | 02 /
Kay, Christopher Paul ACTIA (UK) Ltd., Unit 81 Mochdre Enterprise Park Newtown, Powys SY16 4LE / GB | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2011/17] | Matthews, Paul Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Matthews, Paul Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250907.8 | 05.03.2007 | [2007/36] | Priority number, date | GB20060004239 | 03.03.2006 Original published format: GB 0604239 | GB20060021917 | 03.11.2006 Original published format: GB 0621917 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1830607 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1830607 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
B60Q1/305 (EP,US);
H05B45/37 (EP,US);
H05B45/40 (EP,US);
H05B47/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | Beleuchtung und Systeme zur Beleuchtungssteuerung | [2007/36] | English: | Lighting and systems for controlling lighting | [2007/36] | French: | Eclairage et systèmes de contrôle de l'éclairage | [2007/36] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | BE | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | LV | 18.08.2010 | MT | 18.08.2010 | PL | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | LU | 05.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5563472 (CASSIDY ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1,17 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 9; figure 2 *; | [A]US2002140380 (BIEBL ALOIS [DE]) [A] 1,17* paragraph [0040]; figure 6 *; | [Y]EP1324641 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL [GB]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0007] *; | [Y]US2005062481 (VAUGHN THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0022] , [0050]; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2006012633 (MAGNA INT INC, et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * |