EP1832919 - Rotational member, rotational member of projector and projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, 7 Chome, Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Yoshiyuki c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, 7-Chome Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2011/42] |
Former [2007/37] | 01 /
Okada, Yoshiyuki c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, 7-Chome Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07250944.1 | 07.03.2007 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | JP20060060405 | 07.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006060405 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1832919 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1832919 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1832919 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/14, G05G1/10 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
G05G1/10 (EP,US);
G03B21/142 (EP,US);
G03B21/145 (EP,US);
G05G1/02 (EP,US);
G03B2205/0053 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/29] |
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rotierendes Element, rotierendes Element eines Projektors und Projektor | [2007/37] | English: | Rotational member, rotational member of projector and projector | [2007/37] | French: | Élément rotatif, élément rotatif d'un projecteur, et projecteur | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 08.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5035528 (THAU WOLFGANG [CA]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 2, line 59 - page 3, line 28; figure 4 *; | [Y]US5469758 (HOWIE JR ROBERT K [US]) [Y] 10 * page 2, line 54 - line 56 *; | [XY]GB2319058 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 2, line 11 - line 28; figures 4-6 * [Y] 10; | [DA]JP2000161345 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]JP2002040556 (NIFCO INC) [DA] 1* abstract * |