EP1895415 - Storage system and backup method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | For all designated states HITACHI COMPUTER PERIPHERALS CO., LTD. 781, Sakai, Nakai-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0180 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | ||
For all designated states HITACHI COMPUTER PERIPHERALS CO., LTD. 781, Sakai, Nakai-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0180 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murayama, Tomonori c/o Hitachi, Ltd. I.P. Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Mizuno, Yoichi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. I.P. Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2008/10] | Hodsdon, Stephen James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251100.9 | 15.03.2007 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | JP20060237671 | 01.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006237671 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1895415 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1895415 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
G06F11/1458 (EP,US);
G06F11/1451 (EP,US);
G06F11/1456 (EP,US);
G06F11/1469 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2012/33] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Speichersystem und Sicherungsverfahren | [2008/10] | English: | Storage system and backup method | [2008/10] | French: | Système de stockage et procédé de sauvegarde | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 31.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.07.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.12.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2306022 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6,7 * * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 10 * * page 9, lines 15-19 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 14 * * page 13, lines 5-23 * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 4 * * page 16, lines 6-19 * * page 26, line 3 - page 27, line 6 *; | [A]US2005240813 (OKADA WATARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 8,13 * * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] , [0055] - [0058] - [0094] *; | [A]US5522037 (KITAGAWA ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 30 *; | [A]US2004267903 (IDO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0039] * | by applicant | JP2006237671 | EP2306022 | JPH11212875 |