EP1837569 - Self supporting reinforced header pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Babcock & Wilcox Power Generation Group, Inc. 20 South Van Buren Avenue Barberton OH 44203-0351 / US | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states The Babcock & Wilcox Company 20 S. Van Buren Avenue Barberton, OH 44203-0351 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Ronald B. 2710 Star Lane Wadsworth Ohio 44281 / GB | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Meldrum, David James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Meldrum, David James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/39] | Meldrum, David James, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251166.0 | 20.03.2007 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | US20060785499P | 24.03.2006 Original published format: US 785499 P | US20070686437P | 15.03.2007 Original published format: US 686437 P | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1837569 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1837569 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1837569 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/00, F16L9/00, F16L9/128 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
F16L9/128 (EP,US);
B01D47/00 (KR);
F16L3/00 (EP,US);
F16L9/006 (EP,US);
Y10S138/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Title | German: | Selbsttragende verstärkte Sammelleitung | [2007/39] | English: | Self supporting reinforced header pipe | [2007/39] | French: | Tuyau collecteur autoportant renforcé | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.06.2012 | CY | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | IE | 20.03.2013 | LU | 20.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
IE | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
IE | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
IE | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | BE | 27.06.2012 | |
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5079056 (WATKINS RICHARD L T [US]) [A] 1,14 * column 1, line 16 - line 22 * * figure 6 *; | [A]DE3439170 (WESCH LUDWIG) [A] 1,14 * abstract * * page 8, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * figure 6 *; | [A]JPS6261617 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [A] 1,14 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [A]GB1003624 (TECALEMIT ENGINEERING) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]JPH07241436 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1,14 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * |