EP1836981 - A bone fracture fixation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deffenbaugh, Daren L. 1408 Winchester Ct. Winona Lake, IN 46590 / US | 02 /
Schulze, Dale R. 333 Patton Drive Springboro, OH 45066 / US | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251191.8 | 21.03.2007 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | US20060388264 | 24.03.2006 Original published format: US 388264 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1836981 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/68 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
A61B17/683 (EP,US);
A61B17/8047 (EP,US);
A61B17/8875 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fixiersystem für Knochenbrüche | [2007/39] | English: | A bone fracture fixation system | [2007/39] | French: | Système de fixation d'une fracture osseuse | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |