02.02.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
29.10.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.05.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.08.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.06.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.10.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.04.2009 |
First examination report |
|
21.04.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
09.05.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
06.05.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.10.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |
31.08.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |