EP1841198 - Image processing device, image processing method, and information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuda, Kohij 1-10-23-102, Akatsutsumi Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251441.7 | 30.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP20060094902 | 30.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006094902 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1841198 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32, G06F3/12 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/1288 (EP,US);
H04N1/00954 (EP,US);
H04N1/32502 (EP,US);
H04N1/32587 (EP,US);
H04N1/32593 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/24] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bildverarbeitung sowie Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium | [2007/40] | English: | Image processing device, image processing method, and information recording medium | [2007/40] | French: | Dispositif de traitement d'images, procédé de traitement d'images, et support d'enregistrement d'informations | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 12.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001008449 (OKADA SADAMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [A]JP2002092168 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]EP1377024 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]JP2004015308 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US2005200860 (YAMADA MASAHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0058] , [0059]; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2005094056 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * | Examination | US5687332 | US2002006235 | EP1498811 | by applicant | JP2005176159 | WO2005094056 |