EP1850598 - Video coding and decoding with partial parallel processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Yoshiyuki Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fukushima, Tetsuya Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yanagita, Yukio Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Horner, David Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Horner, David Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251643.8 | 19.04.2007 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | JP20060122890 | 27.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006122890 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1850598 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
H04N19/436 (EP,US);
H04N19/42 (KR);
H04N19/423 (EP,US);
H04N19/43 (EP,US);
H04N19/433 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/28] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Videokodierung und -dekodierung mit teilweisem Parallelbetrieb | [2007/44] | English: | Video coding and decoding with partial parallel processing | [2007/44] | French: | Codage et décodage vidéo avec traitement en parallèle partiel | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 09.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6163576 (LEMPEL MODY [US]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * column 7, line 37 - line 39 * * column 7, line 51 - column 9, line 49; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO03107679 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 11 * * page 6, paragraph 39 * * claim - *; | [A]WO2005104027 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - page 4, line 26 *; | [A]EP0632662 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, line 51 - page 3, line 4 * * page 3, line 39 - line 46 * * page 5, line 16 - line 26; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1061747 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 11-15; claims 1,2 * * page 3, paragraph 21; figure 1b *; | [A]US5696698 (HERLUISON JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 3 * * column 1, paragraph 35 - column 2, paragraph 4 *; | [AD]EP1622391 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document * | [Y] - CMAR R ET AL, "Highly scalable parallel parametrizable architecture of the motion estimator", EUROPEAN DESIGN AND TEST CONFERENCE, 1997. ED&TC 97. PROCEEDINGS PARIS, FRANCE 17-20 MARCH 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970317), ISBN 0-8186-7786-4, pages 208 - 212, XP002337994 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EDTC.1997.582360 | [A] - JEN-CHIEH TUAN ET AL, "On the Data Reuse and Memory Bandwidth Analysis for Full-Search Block-Matching VLSI Architecture", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200201), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 1051-8215, XP011014269 [A] 1-7 * page 63; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.981846 | [A] - LEE C L, "PARALLEL IMPLEMENTATION OF MOTION-COMPENSATION FOR HDTV VIDEO DECODER", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199805), ISSN 0098-3063, pages 251 - 255, XP000789832 [A] 1-7 * figures 4,6 * * page 253, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.681934 |