EP1855352 - Antenna apparatus and article management system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Akiko c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sekine, Shuichi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07251944.0 | 11.05.2007 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | JP20060134545 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006134545 | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1855352 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/20, H01Q21/00, H01Q21/12, H01Q1/22 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2216 (EP,US);
H01Q13/206 (EP,US);
H01Q21/0006 (EP,US);
H01Q21/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/30] |
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antennenvorrichtung und Artikelverwaltungssystem | [2007/46] | English: | Antenna apparatus and article management system | [2007/46] | French: | Appareil à antenne et système de gestion d'articles | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 15.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.04.2010 | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/31] | 26.03.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 08.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2606271 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT) [Y] 3,4,6,8,10,12,14 * page 6 - page 7; figures 1,2,5 *; | [Y]US2236393 (BECK ALFRED C, et al) [Y] 3,4,6,8,10,12,14 * figure 1 *; | [X]GB2107936 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) [X] 3,4,6,12,14 * page 3, line 66 - line 79; figure 3 *; | [A]US2003206107 (GOFF EDWARD D [US], et al) [A] 15 * the whole document * |