EP1857003 - Footwear sole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolverine World Wide, Inc. 9341 Courtland Drive N.E. Rockford, Michigan 49351 / US | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoenborn, Mary L. 11121 Wellman Avenue NE Rockford, Michigan 49341 / US | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07252006.7 | 16.05.2007 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | US20060419043 | 18.05.2006 Original published format: US 419043 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1857003 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1857003 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/12, A43B13/20 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
A43B13/206 (EP,US);
A43B13/026 (EP,US);
A43B13/12 (EP,US);
A43B13/125 (EP);
A43B13/143 (EP,US);
A43B13/181 (EP,US);
A43B13/186 (EP,US);
A43B13/188 (EP,US);
A43B7/08 (EP,US);
A43B7/144 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/38] |
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schuhsohle | [2007/47] | English: | Footwear sole | [2007/47] | French: | Semelle de chaussure | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/02] | 19.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3130046 (SVENSKA TOBAKS AB [SE]) [A] 1-10,18* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4782603 (BROWN STEPHEN C [US]) [A] 1-10,18 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XA]US5005300 (DIAZ JUAN A [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 3, lines 46-58; figure -; claim - * [A] 18; | [XA]DE10123252 (KASDORF BERND [DE]) [X] 1-10 [A] 18; | [PXA]EP1728446 (WOLVERINE WORLD WIDE INC [US]) [PX] 1-10 * figure -; claim - * [PA] 18 |