EP1867896 - Device and method of controlling a belt-type continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyoda, Shinya c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Taniguchi, Hiroji c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Soga, Yoshinobu c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Matsui, Yasunari c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
Tamura, Tadashi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
Hino, Akira c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
Tanaka, Naoto c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 08 /
Matsuo, Kenji c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Albutt, Anthony John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Albutt, Anthony John D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/51] | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07252428.3 | 14.06.2007 | [2007/51] | Priority number, date | JP20060166709 | 15.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006166709 | JP20060205379 | 27.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006205379 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1867896 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1867896 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/662 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
F16H61/0021 (EP,US);
F16H61/6625 (EP,US);
F16H61/66272 (EP,US);
F16H61/66259 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/26] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung eines stufenlosen Riemengetriebes | [2007/51] | English: | Device and method of controlling a belt-type continuously variable transmission | [2007/51] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de contrôle d'une transmission continuellement variable de type courroie | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 21.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2007013792 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [XP] 1-3,10 * pages 1-12; figures 1,3,5,7,8 *; | [XI]EP1396665 (JATCO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * column 1 - column 11; figures 1,3,4,5,6,7 * [I] 5,6; | [X]EP1403568 (JATCO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7,9,10 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0054]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2006063641 (OSHITA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0022] - [0028] - [0032] , [0036] , [0040]; figures 1,3 *; | [X]JP2006097811 (JATCO LTD) [X] 1,4-6,10 * abstract *; | [A]US2006111207 (OGATA YUSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1,4-6,10 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0052]; figure 6 * | by applicant | JPH06109114 |