Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008244557 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74850107 | 15.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008244047 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74722907 | 11.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090003060 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74850107 | 15.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090003059 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74722907 | 11.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008257675 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74722907 | 11.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008257674 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74850107 | 15.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1978672 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2010 | B1 | EP1978672 | 08.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74722907 | 11.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1978671 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74850107 | 15.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101281622B | 24.08.2011 | B | CN101281622 | 08.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74850107 | 15.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101281623 | 08.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101281624B | 26.10.2011 | B | CN101281624 | 08.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74722907 | 11.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602007008829D1 | 14.10.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74722907 | 11.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200841241 | 16.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74722907 | 11.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200841256 | 16.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US74850107 | 15.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008244064 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US76208207 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100945282B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2010 | B1 | KR20080090248 | 08.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US76208207 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008257676 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US76208207 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1978443 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2008 | A3 | EP1978443 | 08.10.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US76208207 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200841260 | 16.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US90971107 | 02.04.2007 | US76208207 | 13.06.2007 |