Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
22.05.2015 | Definitive list of designations | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
27.02.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.09.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
12.09.2014 | Change - classification | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
12.09.2014 | Change - classification | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
30.08.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.07.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.07.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.07.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.07.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.07.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.12.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
14.12.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |