Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7564680 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2009 | B2 | US2008007903 | 10.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20060064455 | 10.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080005732 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20060064455 | 10.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1879440 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2014 | A3 | EP1879440 | 16.01.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20060064455 | 10.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101106878B | 05.10.2011 | B | CN101106878 | 16.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20060064455 | 10.07.2006 |