EP1975032 - Transportation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Hideyuki c/o Hitachi Ltd. IP Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Seiichi c/o Hitachi Ltd. IP Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Kawasaki, Takeshi c/o Hitachi Ltd. IP Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Miyamoto, Toshiharu c/o Hitachi Ltd. IP Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253238.5 | 16.08.2007 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | JP20070092504 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007092504 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1975032 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1975032 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B61G11/16 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B61G11/16 (EP,US);
B61F19/04 (KR);
B61D15/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | Transportvorrichtung | [2008/40] | English: | Transportation device | [2008/40] | French: | Dispositif de transport | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | BE | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | MT | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | IE | 16.08.2010 | LU | 16.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | HU | 29.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 16.08.2010 | ||
LU | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH265703 (SCHWEIZ WAGONS AUFZUEGEFAB [CH]) [A] 1,2* figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE9311041U (CKD LOKOMOTIVKA A S [CS]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10037050 (SCHNEIDER SIEGHARD [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2836108 (ACIERIES DE PLOERMEL [FR]) [X] 1,2 * figures 4,4a * | by applicant | FR2836108 |