EP1892924 - Method for importing digital rights management data for user domain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pantech Co., Ltd. Pantech R&D Center 1-2 DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-270 / KR | [2014/15] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states PANTECH CO., LTD. Pantech R&D Center 1-2 DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-270 / KR | ||
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states Pantech Co., Ltd. Pantech R&D Center I-2, DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | ||
For all designated states Pantech&Curitel Communications, Inc. Pantech R&D Center I-2, DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong-So-young 613-308 Sinnae 6-danji Apt. Sinnae 2-dong Jungrang-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Gun-wook 610-302 Bamgasi Maeul Jeongbalsan-dong Ilsandong-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Kyung 202-509 Gukhwa Apt Samcheon-dong Seo-gu Daejeon-si / KR | [2014/15] |
Former [2008/09] | 01 /
Jeong-So-young 613-308 Sinnae 6-danji Apt. Sinnae 2-dong Jungrang-gu Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Gun-wook 610-302 Bamgasi Maeul Jeongbalsan-dong Ilsandong-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Park, Kyung 202-509 Gukhwa Apt Samcheon-dong Seo-gu Daejeon-si / KR | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/50] | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Kopernikusstrasse 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253313.6 | 21.08.2007 | [2008/09] | Priority number, date | KR20060079066 | 21.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060079066 | KR20060098167 | 09.10.2006 Original published format: KR 20060098167 | KR20060101531 | 18.10.2006 Original published format: KR 20060101531 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1892924 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1892924 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1892924 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/10, H04L29/06 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/09] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Import von Daten zur digitalen Rechteverwaltung für eine Benutzerdomäne | [2008/09] | English: | Method for importing digital rights management data for user domain | [2008/09] | French: | Procédé pour l'importation de données de gestion de droits numériques pour domaine d'utilisateur | [2008/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.08.2007 | AT | 09.04.2014 | BE | 09.04.2014 | CY | 09.04.2014 | CZ | 09.04.2014 | DK | 09.04.2014 | EE | 09.04.2014 | ES | 09.04.2014 | FI | 09.04.2014 | IT | 09.04.2014 | LT | 09.04.2014 | LV | 09.04.2014 | MC | 09.04.2014 | MT | 09.04.2014 | NL | 09.04.2014 | PL | 09.04.2014 | RO | 09.04.2014 | SE | 09.04.2014 | SI | 09.04.2014 | SK | 09.04.2014 | TR | 09.04.2014 | BG | 09.07.2014 | GR | 10.07.2014 | IS | 09.08.2014 | PT | 11.08.2014 | IE | 21.08.2014 | LU | 21.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.08.2007 | |
AT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
MT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 21.08.2014 | ||
LU | 21.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
MT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 21.08.2014 | ||
LU | 21.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
MT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 21.08.2014 | ||
LU | 21.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 21.08.2014 | ||
LU | 21.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 21.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 21.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 21.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 09.04.2014 | |
BG | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - KRAVITZ D W ET AL ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, "ACHIEVING MEDIA PORTABILITY THROUGH LOCAL CONTENT TRANSLATION AND END-TO-END RIGHTS MANAGEMENT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH. ACM WORKSHOP ON DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT. DRM'05. ALEXANDRIA, VA, NOV.7, 2005, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM WORKSHOP ON DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT. (DRM), NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20051107), ISBN 1-59593-230-5, pages 27 - 36, XP001503025 [X] 1-19 * Abstract Section 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1102546.1102552 | [A] - SAFAVI-NAINI REIHANEH ET AL, "Import/Export in digital rights management", ACM WORKSHOP ON DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT, XX, XX, (20041025), pages 99 - 110, XP002414309 [A] 1-19 * Abstract Sections 1, 9 * | [A] - THOMSON MULTIMEDIA, "SmartRight Contribution to Rights Management & Protection Specifications", INTERNET CITATION, (20020522), URL: http://www.tv-anytime.org, (20041215), XP002310904 [A] 1-19 * Summary Section 2.5.2 * | [T] - OMA, "Secure Content Exchange Architecture - Draft Version 0.3 - OMA-AD-SCE-V0_3-20060830-D", OMA STANDARD, (20060803), URL: http://member.openmobilealliance.org/ftp/Public_documents/DRM/Permanent_documents/OMA-AD-SCE-V0_3-20060830-D.zip, (20080121), XP002465350 | Examination | - "Secure Content Exchange Architecture ; OMA-AD-SCE-V0_2-20060816-D", no. .2, (20060816), pages 1 - 12, OMA-AD-SCE-V0_2-20060816-D, OPEN MOBILE ALLIANCE (OMA), 4330 LA JOLLA VILLAGE DR., SUITE 110 SAN DIEGO, CA 92122 ; USA, URL: ftp/Public_documents/DRM/Permanent_documents/, (20060816), XP064078484 | by applicant | - DAVID W. KRAVITZ ET AL., "Achieving Media Portability through Local Content Translation and End-to-End Rights Management", PROCCEDINGS OF THE 5TH. ACM WORKSHOP ON DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT |