EP2014637 - Process for the production of HFO trans-1234ZE from HFC-245FA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Change - representative | 27.01.2017 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | 27.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Haiyou 811 Campbell Boulevard Amherst, NY 14228 / US | 02 /
Tung, Hsueh Sung 16 Vassar Drive Getzville, NY / US | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Stepney, Gregory John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2009/03] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253347.4 | 24.08.2007 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | US20060839873P | 24.08.2006 Original published format: US 839873 P | US20070775318 | 10.07.2007 Original published format: US 775318 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014637 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/25, C07C17/38, C07C21/18 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
C07C17/087 (EP,US);
C07C17/20 (KR);
C07C17/25 (EP,KR,US);
C07C17/278 (KR);
C07C17/38 (EP,US);
C07C17/383 (EP,US);
Y02P20/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/087, C07C19/08 (EP,US);
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (US,EP);
C07C17/383, C07C21/18 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/38] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von HFO trans-1234ZE aus HFC-245FA | [2009/03] | English: | Process for the production of HFO trans-1234ZE from HFC-245FA | [2009/03] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de HFO trans-1234ZE à partir de HFC-245FA | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 15.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/09] | 24.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.01.2017 | 26.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP17152564.5 / EP3176147 | EP21217051.8 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0939071 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [YD] 6* claims 1,13; example 10 *; | [XY]US5986151 (VAN DER PUY MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * claims 1,2; example 1-10, 19-21 * * claims 1,2; example 1-10, 19-21 * [Y] 6; | [XDY]US6124510 (ELSHEIKH MAHER Y [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-10 * claims 1-3; examples 1,2 * * claims 1-3; examples 1,2 * [Y] 6; | [XY]US2005090698 (MERKEL DANIEL C [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10 * paragraph 41; example 6 * * paragraph 41; example 6 * [Y] 6; | [XY]WO2007019355 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10 * claim 1; page 11, lines 30-35 * * claim 1; page 11, lines 30-35 * [Y] 6; | [E]EP1900716 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [E] 1-5,7-10 * claims 1-11; examples 1,4 * |