EP2031357 - A universal input/output module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maier, Josef Lerchenring 11 86754 Munningen / DE | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253394.6 | 29.08.2007 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2031357 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2031357 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01D21/02 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
G01D21/02 (EP,US);
H03M1/1295 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/46] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Universelles Eingangs-/Ausgangsmodul | [2009/10] | English: | A universal input/output module | [2009/10] | French: | Module d'entrée/sortie universel | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9932856 (SIMMONDS PRECISION PRODUCTS [US]) [X] 6 * page 6, line 11 - page 14, line 14; figures 1-4 * [Y] 1,4,10; | [Y]US2005134488 (ALTER DAVID M [US]) [Y] 1,4,10 * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *; | [E]US2008007441 (MAIER JOSEF [DE]) [E] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006007105 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9932856 | US2005134488 |